Townsend v. Blount County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Townsend
Defendant: Chris Cantrell, T Hutsell, Perry Covington, Blount County Jail and James Berrong
Case Number: 3:2019cv00466
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT ORDER re #6 Memorandum & Opinion Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/30/2019. (BDG)Judgment mailed to Townsend.
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/30/2019. (BDG)Order mailed to Townsend.
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/22/2019. (BDG) Memorandum and order mailed to Custodian of inmate accounts and AttorneyGeneral for the State of Tennessee. Serviced via ECF to courts financial deputy. Plaintiff a service packet (a blank summons and USM 285 form) mailed to Townsend.
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EDUCATION ORDER for pro se prisoner filers. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 11/20/19. (c/m to Thomas Townsend BLOUNT COUNTY DETENTION CENTER 920 E LAMAR ALEXANDER PARKWAY MARYVILLE, TN 37804 ) (ADA)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (copy mailed to Thomas Townsend at Blounty County Jail) (JBR)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Townsend. (JBR)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Townsend, filed by Thomas Townsend.(JBR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townsend v. Blount County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Hutsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blount County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Berrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?