American Reliable Insurance Company et al v. United States of America (JRG3)
Plaintiff: Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Fire Insurance Exchange, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, American Reliable Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Nautilus Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, United National Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Company, American Security Insurance Company and Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00469
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 137 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, it is hereby ORDERED that the above referenced case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable J. Ronnie Greer, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. United States Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton is hereby ASSIGNED to handle any matters routinely considered by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and the Rules of this Court. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/3/19. (ABF)
December 2, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America on November 27, 2019 (Evans, Matthew) Modified text on 12/2/2019 to reflect this filing as a summons, not a subpoena (AYB).
November 20, 2019 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to United States of America c/o U.S. Attorney (AYB)
November 20, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Reliable Insurance Company, American Security Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nautilus Insurance Company, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, United National Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,, Summons to USA to be issued (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Reliable Insurance Company, American Security Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nautilus Insurance Company, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, United National Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,, #17 Notice (Other),, Amended Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibits 1 through 7 (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/19/2019. (AMP)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/19/2019. (AMP)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/19/2019. (AMP)
November 19, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to United States of America. (AMP)
November 19, 2019 Filing 20 Administrative Notice to Counsel: No action to be taken. For future reference, please file the Certificate of Corporate Interest in a non-fillable form. (AMP)
November 19, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AMP)
November 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits 1-7 by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Reliable Insurance Company, American Security Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nautilus Insurance Company, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, United National Insurance Company re #17 Notice of Manual Filing to the #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7) Papers were presented in paper format to the Clerk's Office (AYB)
November 19, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Standard Guaranty Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew) Modified docket text on 11/19/2019 to reflect correct filing (AMP).
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Reliable Insurance Company, American Security Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nautilus Insurance Company, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, United National Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,, of Manual Filing of Exhibits 1 through 7 to the Complaint (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint,, Civil Cover Sheet by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Reliable Insurance Company, American Security Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nautilus Insurance Company, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, United National Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Truck Insurance Exchange. (Evans, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Illinois Farmers Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Foremost Signature Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan. (Evans, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Fire Insurance Exchange. (Evans, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Farmers Insurance Exchange. (Evans, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Standard Guaranty Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Corporate Interest by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Evans, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Corporate Interest by American Security Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by United National Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by American Reliable Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4134142.), filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, American Security Insurance Company, Fire Insurance Exchange, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, United National Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nautilus Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Reliable Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company.(Evans, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Reliable Insurance Company et al v. United States of America (JRG3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fire Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foremost Signature Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Farmers Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Reliable Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United National Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truck Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?