University of Tennessee Research Foundation v. Caelum Biosciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: University of Tennessee Research Foundation
Defendant: Caelum Biosciences, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00508
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael Hynes and #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Strongosky (AYB)
February 6, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Strongosky ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4223842.) by Caelum Biosciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing)(Elder, John)
February 6, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael Hynes ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4223829.) by Caelum Biosciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing)(Elder, John)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AGREED ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 2/14/2020. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/3/20. (KFB)
January 28, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Caelum Biosciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-proposed Agreed Order for Extensions of Time to Respond)(Elder, John)
January 9, 2020 Filing 16 Defendant's Amended Disclosure Statement by Caelum Biosciences, Inc. re #14 Certificate of Corporate Interest. (Elder, John) Modified text on 1/10/2020 (AYB).
January 8, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Caelum Biosciences, Inc.. (Elder, John)
January 8, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Caelum Biosciences, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fortress Biotech, Inc. for Caelum Biosciences, Inc.. (Elder, John)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by University of Tennessee Research Foundation. Caelum Biosciences, Inc. served on 12/19/2019. (Ritchie, Wayne)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 12/16/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
December 12, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (AYB)
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Eric Hanson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90: K3039384) by University of Tennessee Research Foundation. (AYB)
December 12, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (AYB)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Daniel Hipskind to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90: K3039377) by University of Tennessee Research Foundation. (AYB)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Dorian Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90: K3039377) by University of Tennessee Research Foundation. (AYB)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by University of Tennessee Research Foundation. (Ritchie, Wayne)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 12/11/2019. (AMP)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 12/11/2019. (AMP)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 12/11/2019. (AMP)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Caelum Biosciences, Inc. (AMP)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint: Please refile the Corporate Disclosure Statement using the event Certificate of Corporate Interest under Other Documents. Requirements due by 12/16/2019. (AMP)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorneys Daniel Hipskind, Dorian Berger, and Eric Hanson are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (AMP)
December 11, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AMP)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caelum Biosciences, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4155389.), filed by University of Tennessee Research Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons TO BE ISSUED, #3 Other Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Ritchie, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: University of Tennessee Research Foundation v. Caelum Biosciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caelum Biosciences, Inc.
Represented By: John W Elder
Represented By: Thomas Howard Jarvis
Represented By: Lindsey M Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Tennessee Research Foundation
Represented By: Wayne A Ritchie, II
Represented By: Dorian S Berger
Represented By: Daniel P Hipskind
Represented By: Eric B Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?