Hudson v. QRS, Inc.
Plaintiff: James G Hudson
Defendant: QRS, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00525
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Court will construe the Response as notice that Attorney Carringer is no longer acting as counsel for Plaintiff, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Attorney Carringer from this case. The Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 2/12/20. (JBR) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Kent M Carringer on 2/12/2020 (JBR).
February 11, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by James G Hudson. (Taylor, Jeffrey)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Attorney Kent Carringer is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE on or before February 24, 2020, as to why he should not be removed as an attorney of record in this case and why other appropriate sanctions should not issue for his failure to comply with the Courts Notice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to Show Cause to Attorney Carringer. Show Cause Response due by 2/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 2/7/20. (c/m to Kent M Carringer, Carroll Anderson & Foust, LLP, 422 South Gay Street, Suite 302, Knoxville, TN 37902) (ABF)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 2/6/20. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-consent Form) (JBR)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 2/6/2020. (KTC)
February 6, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by QRS, Inc..(Morrison, Eric)
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #8 Amended Complaint re Extension of Time to File an Answer by All Defendants. (Morrison, Eric)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Corporate Interest by QRS, Inc.. (Morrison, Eric)
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven David Lipsey, Jr on behalf of QRS, Inc. (Lipsey, Steven)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J Morrison on behalf of QRS, Inc. (Morrison, Eric)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against QRS, Inc.., filed by James G Hudson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Taylor, Jeffrey)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James G Hudson. QRS, Inc. served on 12/26/2019., AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on QRS, Inc. on 12/26/2019, filed by James G Hudson. (Taylor, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on December 20, 2019. (SAC)Mailed to Attorney Kent M Carringer.
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on December 20, 2019. (SAC)Mailed to Attorney Carringer.
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on December 20, 2019. (SAC)Mailed to Attorney Carringer.
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Attorney Kent Carringer. (SAC)Notice mailed to Kent Carringer.
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to QRS, Inc. (SAC)
December 20, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (SAC)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against QRS, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4167137.), filed by James G Hudson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - EEOC Dismissal & Notice, #2 Other Civil Coversheet, #3 Summons)(Taylor, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. QRS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James G Hudson
Represented By: Jeffrey C Taylor
Represented By: Kent M Carringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QRS, Inc.
Represented By: Eric J Morrison
Represented By: Steven David Lipsey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?