Oliver v. Knox County Sheriff's Department, et al (PLR1)
Plaintiff: DaySparkles Oliver
Defendant: Knox County Sheriff's Department, Tennessee Department of Safety and Homeland Security and Knox County Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2020cv00258
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate Judge by Tennessee Department of Safety and Homeland Security (Jones, Miranda)
July 30, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #14 MOTION to Decline Supplemental Jurisdiction, #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support, #17 MOTION to Dismiss, #16 MOTION to Stay, #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Tennessee Department of Safety and Homeland Security. (Jones, Miranda)
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw Motion for Leave by Jeffrey C. Coller to Make Limited Appearance by DaySparkles Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Moncier Orders)(Coller, Jeffrey) Modified text on 7/29/2020 (JBR).
July 28, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support filed by Knox County Sheriff's Department, Knox County Tennessee. (Wigler, David)
July 28, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Decline Supplemental Jurisdiction, #17 MOTION to Dismiss, #16 MOTION to Stay, #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Knox County Sheriff's Department, Knox County Tennessee. (Wigler, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by DaySparkles Oliver. (AYB)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Abstain and Stay Proceedings by DaySparkles Oliver. (AYB)
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Knox County Tennessee's Motion for Summary Judgment #10 and Knox County's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #11 by DaySparkles Oliver. (AYB)
July 21, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Decline Supplemental Jurisdiction by DaySparkles Oliver. (AYB)
July 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave By Jeffery C. Coller to Make Limited Appearance by DaySparkles Oliver. (AYB)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Herbert Moncier re #8 Order noting a true and correct copy of this Court's Order entered July 7, 2020 Doc #8 was served on DaySparkle Oliver on July 13, 2020 (AYB)
July 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Knox County Sheriff's Department, Knox County Tennessee. (Wigler, David)
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support by Knox County Sheriff's Department, Knox County Tennessee. (Wigler, David)
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Knox County Sheriff's Department, Knox County Tennessee in support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Gardner Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Forfeiture, #4 Exhibit 4 - Request for Hearing, #5 Exhibit 5 - Forfeiture Warrants, #6 Exhibit 6 - Appeal Notice)(Wigler, David)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff SHALL have thirty (30) days from the entry of the instant Order to retain new counsel and have new counsel enter an appearance in this case. If new counsel does not make an appearance in this case within thirty (30) days, Plaintiff will be required to proceed pro se. Attorney Moncier is hereby ORDERED to submit a certificate of service within fourteen (14) days of the instant Order evidencing that he has delivered it to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on July 7, 2020. (copy mailed to attorney Moncier) (AYB)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on June 18, 2020. (copy mailed to attorney Herb Moncier) (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-consent) (AYB)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Tennessee Department of Safety and Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Jones, Miranda)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Knox County Tennessee.(Wigler, David)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 6/12/2020. (JCK)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 6/12/2020. (JCK)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 6/12/2020. (JCK)
June 12, 2020 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JCK)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4372770), filed by Tennessee Department of Safety and Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Attachment to Federal Notice)(Jones, Miranda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Knox County Sheriff's Department, et al (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DaySparkles Oliver
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Coller
Represented By: Herbert S Moncier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: David S Wigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Department of Safety and Homeland Security
Represented By: Miranda Jones
Represented By: Dianna Baker Shew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox County Tennessee
Represented By: David S Wigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?