Reeves v. Tony Parker et al
Plaintiff: Octaivian D Reeves
Defendant: Dr. Gregory Mock, Morgan County Correctional Complex, Tony Parker, Lee Delor, Goldie, Sgt Hicks, Anthony Hill, Sgt Cras, Lieutenant Laughter, Lynch, Mike Parris, Nurse Hicks, David Sexton, Officer Darbe, Lieutenant Walls and Tyler Longmire
Case Number: 3:2020cv00326
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 Letter from Octaivian Reeves re service of summons. (ADA)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ; Defendants have filed a motion seeking an extension of time within which to respond to Plaintiffs written discovery requests in this pro se prisoner's civil rights action for violation of 42 U.S.C. 1983 #13 . Upon due consideration, the Court finds the motion well taken, and it is GRANTED. Defendants have up to and including November 9, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's written discovery requests. Signed by District Judge Thomas A. Varlan on 9/22/20. (c/m Octaivian D Reeves 343731 MORGAN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL COMPLEX Post Office Box 2000 WARTBURG, TN 37887) (ADA)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Goldie, Tyler Longmire, Lynch, Mike Parris, Lieutenant Walls. (Lorch, Pamela)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by Goldie, Tyler Longmire, Lynch, Mike Parris, Lieutenant Walls.(Lorch, Pamela)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Plaintiff Octaivian Reeves has filed a motion seeking entry of default against Defendants in this pro se prisoners civil rights action for violation of 42 U.S.C. 1983 #10 . Inasmuch as a party has not failed to plead or defend until properly served with process, Plaintiff's motion #10 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Thomas A. Varlan on 9/16/20. (c/m Octaivian D Reeves 343731 MORGAN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL COMPLEX Post Office Box 2000 WARTBURG, TN 37887 ) (ADA)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION (Declaration) for Entry of Default as to defendants by Octaivian D Reeves. (ADA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Octaivian Reeves re claims. (ADA)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Officer Darbe, Goldie, Tyler Longmire, Lynch, Mike Parris, and Lieutenant Walls. (forwarded to USM for service) (ADA)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents by Octaivian D Reeves (JBR)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ASSESSED the civil filing fee of $350.00. The custodian of Plaintiff's inmate trust account is DIRECTED to submit the filing fee to the Clerk in the manner set forth. Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel #4 is DENIED. Plaintiff has failed to state a cognizable constitutional claim against Sgt. Hicks, Nurse Hicks, Sgt. Cras, Lieutenant Laughter, Anthony Hill, Tony Parker, David Sexton, Lee Delor, Dr. Gregory Mock, or MCCX, and these Defendants are DISMISSED. The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to send Plaintiff service packets (a blank summons and USM 285 form) for Defendants Longmire, Goldie, Lynch, Darbe, Walls, and Parris. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the service packets and return them to the Clerks Office within twenty-one (21) days of entry of this memorandum and order. Signed by District Judge Thomas A. Varlan on 8/4/20. (c/m Octaivian D Reeves 343731 MCCX MORGAN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL COMPLEX Post Office Box 2000 WARTBURG, TN 37887 with service packets, custodian of inmate accounts and Attorney General for the State of Tennessee)(ADA)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (ADA)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for appointment of counsel by Octaivian D Reeves. (ADA)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Tony Parker, David Sexton, Lee Delor, Mike Parris, Officer Darbe, Lieutenant Walls, Lieutenant Laughter, Tyler Longmire, Goldie, Lynch, Sgt Cras, Sgt Hicks, Gregory Mock, Nurse Hicks, and Anthony Hill, filed by Octaivian D Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - G, #2 Exhibit F - M)(ADA)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION (DECLARATION) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Octaivian D Reeves. (ADA)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 Letter from Octaivian Reeves indicating a complaint has been mailed. (ADA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeves v. Tony Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gregory Mock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan County Correctional Complex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Delor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldie
Represented By: Pamela S Lorch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Cras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Laughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynch
Represented By: Pamela S Lorch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Parris
Represented By: Pamela S Lorch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Darbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Walls
Represented By: Pamela S Lorch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Longmire
Represented By: Pamela S Lorch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octaivian D Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?