Duncan v. Anderson County, TN et al (PSLC2)
Plaintiff: James D Duncan
Defendant: Sgt Robertson, Deputy Parten, Corp Morris, Captain Vowell and Anderson County, TN
Case Number: 3:2020cv00338
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: R Leon Jordan
2 Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. Before the Court is Plaintiff's motion seeking leave to appeal in forma pauperis from this Court's dismissal of his pro se civil rights action for violation of 42 U.S.C. 1983 [Doc. 12]. In its August 10, 2020, Memorandum Opinion #4 , the Court CERTIFIED that any appeal from the judgment dismissing this case would not be taken in good faith. Therefore, the instant motion [Doc. 12] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge R. Leon Jordan on 9/28/20. (c/m James D Duncan 441820 BLEDSOE COUNTY CORRECTIONAL COMPLEX 1045 HORSEHEAD ROAD PIKEVILLE, TN 37367) (ADA)
September 23, 2020 Copy of order mailed to James Duncan (DJH)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Pamela L Reeves no longer assigned to case Case reassigned to District Judge R Leon Jordan for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/23/2020. (DJH)
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by James D Duncan from Anderson County to Bledsoe County. (ADA)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 USCA Case Number 20-6044 for #14 Notice of Appeal filed by James D Duncan. C. Anthony Milton, Case Manager. (ADA)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Judgment Order and #4 Memorandum & Opinion by James D Duncan. (ADA) Modified on 9/10/2020 to note the filing was received in an envelope with another prisoner's filings (ADA).
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Leave to Appeal. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/03/2020. (copy mailed to James Duncan at Anderson County Detention Facility) (KMK)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Judgment Order and #4 Memorandum & Opinion by James D Duncan. (Attachments: #1 USCA Cover Letter)(filed as of 8/24/20 per USCA)(ADA)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by James D Duncan. (filed on 8/24/20 per USCA) (ADA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appeal by James D Duncan. (ADA)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing duplicate #7 Letter to United States District Judge, Magistrate Judge and U.S. District Attorney re case from James D Duncan. (ADA)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 Letter re Copies and Judges Review from James D Duncan. (ADA)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 Letter to United States District Judge, Magistrate Judge and U.S. District Attorney re case from James D Duncan. (ADA)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by James D Duncan (AYB)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT. For the reasons set forth in the memorandum and order filed herewith, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this prisoner's pro se civil rights action, filed under 42 U.S.C. 1983, is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/10/20. (copy mailed to James D Duncan, 441820, ANDERSON COUNTY DETENTION FACILITY, 308 PUBLIC SAFETY LANE, CLINTON, TN 37716, custodian of inmate accounts at ACDF, TN Attorney General and Court's Financial Deputy) (JBR)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #1 ] is GRANTED; 2. Plaintiff is ASSESSED the civil filing fee of $350.00; 3. The custodian of Plaintiff's inmate trust account is DIRECTED to submit the filing fee to the Clerk in the manner set for above; 4. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this memorandum and order to the custodian of inmate accounts at the institution where Plaintiff is now confined, to the Attorney General for the State of Tennessee, and to the Court's financial deputy; 5. Plaintiff has failed to state a claim upon which relief may be granted under 1983, and this action is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A; Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/10/20. (copy mailed to James D Duncan, 441820, ANDERSON COUNTY DETENTION FACILITY, 308 PUBLIC SAFETY LANE, CLINTON, TN 37716, custodian of inmate accounts at ACDF, TN Attorney General and Court's Financial Deputy) (JBR) Modified text on 8/10/2020 (JBR).
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (ADA)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Anderson County, TN, Corp Morris, Deputy Parten, Sgt Robertson, and Captain Vowell, filed by James D Duncan.(ADA)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James D Duncan. (ADA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duncan v. Anderson County, TN et al (PSLC2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Parten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corp Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Vowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson County, TN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?