Beaulieu v. Commissioner of Social Security (TV2)
Plaintiff: Jeffery Beaulieu
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security, Social Security Administration, Commissioner of and J. Douglas Overbey
Interested Party: William P Barr and SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2020cv00353
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Based upon the lack of opposition from Plaintiff and for good cause shown, the Commissioner shall have up to and including December 14, 2020, in which to file the Certified Administrative Record and Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 10/09/2020. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (JTS)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint - SSA by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Attachments: #1 Other Declaration)(Harber, Loretta)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffery Beaulieu. William P Barr served on 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Certified Mail Receipt)(DeVore, Devin)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffery Beaulieu. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Certified Mail Receipt)(DeVore, Devin)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffery Beaulieu. J. Douglas Overbey served on 8/13/2020. (DeVore, Devin)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 (INFORMATIONAL ONLY) Administrative Notice to Counsel re #2 Supplement: Civil Cover Sheet. (BJL) Modified on 8/12/2020 (BJL).
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (BJL)
August 11, 2020 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (BJL)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint - SSA Comm of Social Security Summons by Jeffery Beaulieu. (DeVore, Devin)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint - SSA J. Douglas Overby Summons by Jeffery Beaulieu. (DeVore, Devin)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint - SSA William Barr Summons by Jeffery Beaulieu. (DeVore, Devin)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint - SSA Civil Coversheet by Jeffery Beaulieu. (DeVore, Devin)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Jeffery Beaulieu.(DeVore, Devin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaulieu v. Commissioner of Social Security (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Loretta S Harber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Douglas Overbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Beaulieu
Represented By: Devin Spence DeVore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: William P Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?