Sturgill Management Services, Inc. v. Treeline Transportation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sturgill Management Services, Inc.
Defendant: ATC Knoxville, LLC and Treeline Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00363
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Sturgill Management Services, Inc.. (Stovall, James)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2020 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/2/2020. (KTC)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant ATC Knoxville, LLC shall have until and including October 21, 2020, to file a responsive pleading in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 9/30/20. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (CWS)
September 29, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Treeline Transportation, LLC. (Moffatt, Mary)
September 29, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Sturgill Management Services, Inc.. (Stovall, James)
September 29, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #12 Application for Clerk's Default, filed by Sturgill Management Services, Inc. . (Moffatt, Mary)
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary C Moffatt on behalf of Treeline Transportation, LLC (Moffatt, Mary)
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to Treeline Transportation, LLC by Sturgill Management Services, Inc.. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Counsel)(Stovall, James)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file on or before 10/15/2020, a response showing why its claims against the nonresponsive Defendant should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(b) for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff is hereby put ON NOTICE that if it does not timely file a response showing good cause, its claims against the nonresponsive Defendant may be dismissed. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/21/2020. (BJL)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION EXTENDING ATC KNOXVILLE LLC'S TIME TO RESPOND by Sturgill Management Services, Inc.. (Stovall, James)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M Myatt on behalf of ATC Knoxville, LLC (Myatt, Christopher)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Treeline Transportation, LLC on 08/18/2020, filed by Sturgill Management Services, Inc.. (Ritchie, Wilson)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on ATC Knoxville, LLC on 8/18/2020, filed by Sturgill Management Services, Inc.. (Ritchie, Wilson)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Sturgill Management Services, Inc.. (Ritchie, Wilson)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Treeline Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to ACT Knoxville)(AML)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/18/2020. (AML)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/18/2020. (AML)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/18/2020. (AML)
August 18, 2020 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Sturgill Management Services, Inc.. (AML)
August 18, 2020 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AML)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4448556.), filed by Sturgill Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons for Treeline Transportation, LLC TO BE ISSUED, #6 Summons for ATC Knoxville, LLC TO BE ISSUED)(Ritchie, Wilson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturgill Management Services, Inc. v. Treeline Transportation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sturgill Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Wilson S Ritchie
Represented By: James R Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATC Knoxville, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M Myatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treeline Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Mary C Moffatt
Represented By: Jeffrey M Cranford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?