Ingram v. ADT LLC (PLR2)
Plaintiff: Armenia Ingram
Defendant: ADT, LLC and ADT LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00376
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing:Telephonic Scheduling Conference reset from 10/29/2020 to 10/27/2020 at 3:00 PM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Clifton L Corker.(JCK)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER : The parties have filed a Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting [Doc. 16]. Therefore, a telephonic scheduling conference is set for Thursday, October 29, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. EST. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 866-390-1828 and enter access code 4845352 at the appointed time. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/21/2020. (CAT)
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Miller, Ben)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 10/08/2020. (This entry constitutes the complete order of the Court.) (copy mailed to Daniel S Blynn and Michael A Munoz) (JTS) Modified text on 10/8/2020 (JBR).
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 10/8/2020. (This entry constitutes the complete order of the Court.) (copy mailed to Daniel S Blynn and Michael A Munoz ) (JTS) Modified text on 10/8/2020 (JBR).
October 7, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Munoz ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4510199.) filed by ADT LLC, #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel S. Blynn ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4510218.) filed by ADT LLC (JBR)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel S. Blynn ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4510218.) by ADT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Little, J)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Munoz ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4510199.) by ADT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Little, J)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/25/20. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice Consent/Non-Consent) (JBR)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Pamela L Reeves no longer assigned to case Case reassigned to District Judge Clifton L Corker for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/23/20. (ABF)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by ADT LLC identifying Corporate Parent ADT, Inc. for ADT LLC. (Little, J)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ADT LLC.(Little, J)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Armenia Ingram. ADT LLC served on 8/31/2020. (Miller, Ben)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 08/25/2020. (AMP)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 08/25/2020. (AMP)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 08/25/2020. (AMP)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ADT LLC. (AMP)
August 25, 2020 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AMP)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 COMPLAINT Civil Cover Sheet w/ Summons against ADT, LLC., filed by Armenia Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Summons ADT, LLC)(Miller, Ben) Modified docket text on 8/25/2020 to reflect correct filing (AMP).
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADT, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4457958.), filed by Armenia Ingram.(Miller, Ben)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingram v. ADT LLC (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armenia Ingram
Represented By: Ben Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT LLC
Represented By: Daniel S Blynn
Represented By: Michael A Munoz
Represented By: J Ford Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?