Brown v. Grainger County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy R Brown
Defendant: Grainger County Sheriff's Office and Grainger County Sheriff's Office Medical Staff
Case Number: 3:2020cv00400
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: R Leon Jordan
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
2 Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT ORDER: Plaintiffs pro se complaint for violation of 42 U.S.C. 1983 is DISMISSED pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Because the Court has CERTIFIED in the memorandum opinion that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, should Plaintiff file a notice of appeal, he is DENIED leave to appeal in forma pauperis. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3); Fed. R. App. P. 24. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file.Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 10/30/20. (c/m to Jimmy R Brown #548 041, TROUSDALE TURNER CORRECTIONAL CENTER, 140 MACON WAY, HARTSVILLE, TN 37074)(ABF)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION as set forth in following order. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 10/30/20. (c/m to Jimmy R Brown548 041, TROUSDALE TURNER CORRECTIONAL CENTER, 140 MACON WAY, HARTSVILLE, TN 37074)(ABF)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM & ORDER. Plaintiff's motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ASSESSED the civil filing fee of $350.00. The custodian of Plaintiffs inmate trust account is DIRECTED to submit the filing fee to the Clerk in the manner set forth. Plaintiff has fifteen (15) days from the date of entry of this order to file an amended complaint in the manner set forth. Signed by District Judge R. Leon Jordan on 9/28/20. (c/m Jimmy R Brown 548 041 TROUSDALE TURNER CORRECTIONAL CENTER 140 MACON WAY HARTSVILLE, TN 37074 with 1983 form, custodian of inmate accounts and Attorney General for the State of Tennessee)(ADA)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Pamela L Reeves no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge R Leon Jordan for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on September 22, 2020. (SAC) Modified on 9/23/2020, Order mailed to Brown. (SAC).
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Grainger County Sheriff's Office and Grainger County Sheriff's Office Medical Staff., filed by Jimmy R Brown.(ADA)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Grainger County Sheriff's Office. (Attachments: #1 Mailing envelope)(ADA)
August 11, 2020 Remailed #2 and #3 to plaintiff using Prisoner #5848 041. (ADA)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable sent to Jimmy R Brown re #3 NOTICE of Deficiency (IFP) and #2 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (ADA)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (IFP) - The Court is in receipt of your complaint/petition. However, in order for this matter to proceed, you must either pay the required filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis. (included complaint form) (ADA)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (ADA)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grainger County Sheriff's Office, filed by Jimmy R Brown.(ADA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Grainger County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grainger County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grainger County Sheriff's Office Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy R Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?