Maritel, Inc. et al v. Sea Tow Services International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maritel Alaska, Inc., Maritel Northern Atlantic, Inc., Maritel Mississippi River, Inc., Maritel Northern Pacific, Inc., Maritel Hawaii, Inc., Maritel Great Lakes, Inc., Maritel Southern Pacific, Inc., Maritel Mid-Atlantic, Inc., Maritel, Inc. and Maritel Southern Atlantic, Inc.
Defendant: Sea Tow Services International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00424
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 10/30/2020. (This entry constitutes the complete order of the Court.) (JTS) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Mitchell A Stein on 10/30/2020 (JBR).
October 28, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mitchell A. Stein ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4533228.) filed by Sea Tow Services International, Inc. (JBR)
October 27, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mitchell A. Stein ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4533228.) by Sea Tow Services International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wirth, Steven)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant shall have until and including November 25, 2020, to file a dispositive motion or other responsive pleading in this matter. Plaintiff shall then have thirty (30) days to file a response, and Defendant shall have fourteen (14) days to file a reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 10/26/20. (JBR)
October 22, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint, to Set Briefing Schedule and Waiver of Service by Sea Tow Services International, Inc.. (Wirth, Steven)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 10/20/20. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (CWS)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 10/20/20. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (CWS) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Raye Elliott and Steven Wirth on 10/20/2020 (JBR).
October 16, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Sea Tow Services International, Inc., #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Sea Tow Services International, Inc. (ABF)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3041249.) by Sea Tow Services International, Inc.. (ABF)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3041249.) by Sea Tow Services International, Inc.. (ABF)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Sea Tow Services International, Inc.. (Scott, Robert)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert H Scott on behalf of Sea Tow Services International, Inc. (Scott, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Maritel Alaska, Inc., Maritel Great Lakes, Inc., Maritel Hawaii, Inc., Maritel Mid-Atlantic, Inc., Maritel Mississippi River, Inc., Maritel Northern Atlantic, Inc., Maritel Northern Pacific, Inc., Maritel Southern Atlantic, Inc., Maritel Southern Pacific, Inc., Maritel, Inc. of Filing of Affidavit of Service (Nelson, Jonathan)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Maritel Alaska, Inc., Maritel Great Lakes, Inc., Maritel Hawaii, Inc., Maritel Mid-Atlantic, Inc., Maritel Mississippi River, Inc., Maritel Northern Atlantic, Inc., Maritel Northern Pacific, Inc., Maritel Southern Atlantic, Inc., Maritel Southern Pacific, Inc., Maritel, Inc.. (Nelson, Jonathan)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (KFB)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/28/20. (KFB)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/28/20. (KFB)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/28/20. (KFB)
September 28, 2020 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by All Plaintiffs. (KFB)
September 25, 2020 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (KFB)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sea Tow Services International, Inc., filed by Maritel Southern Atlantic, Inc., Maritel Great Lakes, Inc., Maritel Mississippi River, Inc., Maritel Hawaii, Inc., Maritel Northern Atlantic, Inc., Maritel Southern Pacific, Inc., Maritel, Inc., Maritel Northern Pacific, Inc., Maritel Alaska, Inc., Maritel Mid-Atlantic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs. 1-7, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons)(Nelson, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maritel, Inc. et al v. Sea Tow Services International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritel Alaska, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan E Nelson
Represented By: Russell E Stair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritel Northern Atlantic, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan E Nelson
Represented By: Russell E Stair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritel Mississippi River, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan E Nelson
Represented By: Russell E Stair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritel Northern Pacific, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan E Nelson
Represented By: Russell E Stair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritel Hawaii, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan E Nelson
Represented By: Russell E Stair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritel Great Lakes, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan E Nelson
Represented By: Russell E Stair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritel Southern Pacific, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan E Nelson
Represented By: Russell E Stair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritel Mid-Atlantic, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan E Nelson
Represented By: Russell E Stair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritel, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan E Nelson
Represented By: Russell E Stair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritel Southern Atlantic, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan E Nelson
Represented By: Russell E Stair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Tow Services International, Inc.
Represented By: Robert H Scott
Represented By: Raye Curry Elliott
Represented By: Mitchell A Stein
Represented By: Steven R Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?