Eddy v. Sinito et al (TV1)
Plaintiff: Joshua Eddy
Defendant: SUMMIT 2192 INVESTMENT, LLC, MILLENNIA HOUSING MANAGEMENT, LTD., Frank T. Sinito, SUMMIT 2192 TN, LLC and Millennia Housing Management, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00425
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: In light of the parties agreement, and for good cause shown, the parties Joint Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule #30 is GRANTED. Plaintiff SHALL file any opposition to defendants motions to dismiss and strike no later than December 11, 2020, and defendants SHALL reply to any opposition no later than December 28, 2020. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/25/20. (ABF)
November 23, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE and ORDER (PROPOSED) by Joshua Eddy. (Day, Justin)
November 18, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT BY PARTIES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Joshua Eddy (Day, Justin)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/16/20. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice Consent/Non-Consent) (JBR)
November 13, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, by MILLENNIA HOUSING MANAGEMENT, LTD., Millennia Housing Management, LLC, SUMMIT 2192 INVESTMENT, LLC, SUMMIT 2192 TN, LLC, Frank T. Sinito. (Jones, Benjamin)
November 13, 2020 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MILLENNIA HOUSING MANAGEMENT, LTD., Millennia Housing Management, LLC, SUMMIT 2192 INVESTMENT, LLC, SUMMIT 2192 TN, LLC, Frank T. Sinito. (Jones, Benjamin)
November 13, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss by MILLENNIA HOUSING MANAGEMENT, LTD., Millennia Housing Management, LLC, SUMMIT 2192 INVESTMENT, LLC, SUMMIT 2192 TN, LLC, Frank T. Sinito. (Jones, Benjamin)
November 13, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Frank Sinito filed by Frank T. Sinito. (Jones, Benjamin)
November 13, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant by Frank T. Sinito. (Jones, Benjamin)
November 13, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant filed by SUMMIT 2192 INVESTMENT, LLC. (Jones, Benjamin)
November 13, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant by SUMMIT 2192 INVESTMENT, LLC. (Jones, Benjamin)
November 13, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MILLENNIA HOUSING MANAGEMENT, LTD..(Jones, Benjamin)
November 13, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by SUMMIT 2192 TN, LLC.(Jones, Benjamin)
November 13, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Millennia Housing Management, LLC by Joshua Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Coleman, Greg)
October 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall W Stair on behalf of All Defendants (Stair, Marshall)
October 21, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION Agreed by All Parties for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by All Defendants. (Jones, Benjamin)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 Certificate of Corporate Interest by SUMMIT 2192 TN, LLC. (Jones, Benjamin)
October 21, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Corporate Interest by SUMMIT 2192 INVESTMENT, LLC. (Jones, Benjamin)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Corporate Interest by MILLENNIA HOUSING MANAGEMENT, LTD.. (Jones, Benjamin)
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Millennia Housing Management, LLC. (Jones, Benjamin)
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Benjamin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Eddy. Frank T. Sinito served on 10/1/2020. (Day, Justin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Eddy. MILLENNIA HOUSING MANAGEMENT, LTD. served on 10/1/2020. (Day, Justin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Eddy. SUMMIT 2192 INVESTMENT, LLC served on 10/1/2020. (Day, Justin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Eddy. Millennia Housing Management, LLC served on 10/1/2020. (Day, Justin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Eddy. SUMMIT 2192 TN, LLC served on 10/1/2020. (Day, Justin)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/28/2020. (DJH)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/28/2020. (DJH)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/28/2020. (DJH)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MILLENNIA HOUSING MANAGEMENT, LTD., Millennia Housing Management, LLC, SUMMIT 2192 INVESTMENT, LLC, SUMMIT 2192 TN, LLC, Frank T. Sinito. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(DJH)
September 28, 2020 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (DJH)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4499191.), filed by Joshua Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons [Proposed] Summons - Frank T. Sinito, #3 Summons [Proposed] Summons - MILLENNIA HOUSING MANAGEMENT, LLC, #4 Summons [Proposed] Summons - MILLENNIA HOUSING MANAGEMENT, LTD., #5 Summons [Proposed] Summons - SUMMIT 2192 TN, LLC, #6 Summons [Proposed] Summons - SUMMIT 2192 INVESTMENT, LLC)(Coleman, Greg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eddy v. Sinito et al (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUMMIT 2192 INVESTMENT, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin W Jones
Represented By: Marshall W Stair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILLENNIA HOUSING MANAGEMENT, LTD.
Represented By: Benjamin W Jones
Represented By: Marshall W Stair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank T. Sinito
Represented By: Benjamin W Jones
Represented By: Marshall W Stair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUMMIT 2192 TN, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin W Jones
Represented By: Marshall W Stair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennia Housing Management, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin W Jones
Represented By: Marshall W Stair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Eddy
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Represented By: Adam Arthur Edwards
Represented By: Louis W Ringger, III
Represented By: Mark E Silvey
Represented By: Justin G. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?