Hopman et al v. Hosford (TV2)
Plaintiff: Jay W Hopman and Amy E Hopman
Defendant: Cynthia Britt Hosford
Case Number: 3:2020cv00443
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order (ABF)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/27/20. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Cynthia Britt Hosford.(Franz, Michael)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/21/20. (GRE)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/21/20. (GRE)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/21/20. (GRE)
October 21, 2020 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (GRE)
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sevier County Chancery Court, case number 20-5-105. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4522505), filed by Cynthia Britt Hosford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Franz, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopman et al v. Hosford (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay W Hopman
Represented By: Bruce T Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy E Hopman
Represented By: Bruce T Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Britt Hosford
Represented By: Michael Ryan Franz
Represented By: Raymond E Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?