Dry et al v. Mobile Mini Inc.
Plaintiff: Jonathan Dry and Mitch Harkleroad
Defendant: Mobile Mini and Mobile Mini Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00453
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike #14 Response by Mobile Mini Inc.. (Chapman, David)
December 7, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Chapman, David)
December 4, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Defendant Mobile Mini, Notice of Withdrawal of Jury Demand and Plaintiff's Notice of Jury Demand. (Sharp, Dustin)
December 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Mobile Mini Inc. of Withdrawal of Jury Demand (Chapman, David)
December 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin Sharp on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sharp, Dustin)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2021 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/1/2020. (BDG)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 11/25/20. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (CWS) Modified on 11/30/2020 to indicate c/m to Jennifer Wright Schick, Ansa Assuncao LLP, 5850 Waterloo Road, Suite 140, Columbia, MD 21045 (ABF).
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4566211.) by Mobile Mini Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Chapman, David)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/24/20. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
November 24, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4566211.) filed by Mobile Mini Inc. (ABF)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Mobile Mini Inc..(Chapman, David)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION Pursuant to Local Rule 12.1(a) by Mobile Mini Inc.. (Chapman, David)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2020 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/29/2020. (KTC)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/28/2020. (AML)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/28/2020. (AML)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/28/2020. (AML)
October 28, 2020 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AML)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit Court, case number 2-295-20. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4532534), filed by Mobile Mini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Other Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Chapman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dry et al v. Mobile Mini Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Mini
Represented By: David A. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Mini Inc.
Represented By: David A. Chapman
Represented By: Jennifer Wright Schick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Dry
Represented By: Dustin Sharp
Represented By: Jon M Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitch Harkleroad
Represented By: Dustin Sharp
Represented By: Jon M Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?