Seal v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company (TV1)
Plaintiff: Douglas D Seal
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00462
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 12/4/2020. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
December 3, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number BTNEDC-4575117.) filed by Douglas D Seal (ABF)
December 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number BTNEDC-4575117.) by Douglas D Seal. (Hicky, William)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED ORDER TO PRODUCE HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL RECORDS. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 11/30/20. (ABF)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/24/20. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Baker, John)
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Baker, John)
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Produce Hospital and Medical Records by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, John)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Baker, John)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Baker, Jr on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Baker, John)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas D Seal. Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Hicky, William)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/4/20. (GRE)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/4/20. (GRE)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/4/20. (GRE)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (GRE)
November 4, 2020 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (GRE)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4540163.), filed by Douglas D Seal. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Norfolk Southern Railways Company)(Hicky, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seal v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: John W Baker, Jr
Represented By: Emily L Herman-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas D Seal
Represented By: William B Hicky
Represented By: Charles Edward Sorey, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?