Durham v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Durham
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00554
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Johnson, David)
February 25, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Johnson, David)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 2/25/2021. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (copy mailed to Jacob Flint and Andrew Feldman) (AGA) Modified text on 2/25/2021 (JBR).
February 24, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Feldman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4665210.) by Brenda Durham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Katz, Brian)
February 24, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jacob Flint ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4665196.) by Brenda Durham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Katz, Brian)
February 24, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Feldman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4665210.) filed by Brenda Durham, #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jacob Flint ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4665196.) filed by Brenda Durham (Andrew Feldman's COGS is more than 30 days past, however, the Clerk has verified he is in good standing with the USDC Illinois) (JBR) Modified text on 2/25/2021 (JBR).
February 23, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Sutherland, Kari)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/23/21. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice Consent/Non-Consent) (JBR)
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brenda Durham. (Katz, Brian)
February 17, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against All Defendants., filed by Brenda Durham.(Katz, Brian)
February 12, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Defendants. (Johnson, David)
February 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Johnson, David)
February 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Johnson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Johnson, David)
January 27, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kari L Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Sutherland, Kari)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information, Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 1/4/2021. (BJL)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss, Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 1/4/2021. (BJL)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions, Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 1/4/2021. (BJL)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (BJL)
December 30, 2020 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (BJL)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4604667.), filed by Brenda Durham. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Johnson & Johnson, #3 Summons Ethicon, Inc.)(Katz, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durham v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Represented By: David L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Represented By: David L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Durham
Represented By: Brian Scott Katz
Represented By: Andrew J Feldman
Represented By: Jacob A. Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?