McCoy et al v. United Seating & Mobility, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Edward McCoy, Jr and Sarah Mccoy
Defendant: Carr Access, Inc, United Seating and Mobility, LLC doing business as Numotion, Covenant Health, Fort Sanders Regional Medical Center and Carr Rehab, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00067
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Robert Edward McCoy, Jr, Sarah Mccoy (Smith, T)
March 25, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard M Siciliano on behalf of Carr Access, Inc (Siciliano, Gerard)
March 25, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United Seating and Mobility, LLC. (Presnell, Eric)
March 25, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric T Presnell on behalf of United Seating and Mobility, LLC (Presnell, Eric)
March 5, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Edward McCoy, Jr, Sarah Mccoy. Covenant Health served on 3/2/2021. (Smith, T)
March 5, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Edward McCoy, Jr, Sarah Mccoy. Fort Sanders Regional Medical Center served on 3/2/2021. (Smith, T)
March 5, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Edward McCoy, Jr, Sarah Mccoy. Carr Access, Inc served on 3/2/2021. (Smith, T)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 02/26/2021. (CAT)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 02/26/2021. (CAT)
February 26, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Robert Edward McCoy, Jr, Sarah Mccoy. (Smith, T)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 02/26/2021. (CAT)
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 Administrative Notice to Counsel #7 Supplement Corporate Interest Disclosure Statement : Wrong event used. (Requirements due by 3/3/2021). (LCK)
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Carr Access, Inc, Covenant Health, Fort Sanders Regional Medical Center, United Seating and Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Covenant Health, #2 Summons Fort Sanders Regional Medical Center, #3 Summons United Seating and Mobility, LLC). (LCK)
February 26, 2021 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Corporate Interest Disclosure Statement by Robert Edward McCoy, Jr, Sarah Mccoy. (Smith, T)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons for Carr Access, Inc by Robert Edward McCoy, Jr, Sarah Mccoy. (Smith, T)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons for Covenant Health by Robert Edward McCoy, Jr, Sarah Mccoy. (Smith, T)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons for Fort Sanders Regional Medical Center by Robert Edward McCoy, Jr, Sarah Mccoy. (Smith, T)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons for United Seating and Mobility LLC d/b/a Numotion by Robert Edward McCoy, Jr, Sarah Mccoy. (Smith, T)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Robert Edward McCoy, Jr, Sarah Mccoy. (Smith, T)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4668197.), filed by Robert Edward McCoy, Jr, Sarah Mccoy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Faith)(Smith, T)
February 26, 2021 District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (LCK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy et al v. United Seating & Mobility, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carr Access, Inc
Represented By: Gerard M Siciliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Seating and Mobility, LLC doing business as Numotion
Represented By: Eric T Presnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covenant Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Sanders Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carr Rehab, Inc.
Represented By: Gerard M Siciliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Edward McCoy, Jr
Represented By: T Kenan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Mccoy
Represented By: T Kenan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?