First Peoples Bank of Tennessee v. SimplyBank.
Plaintiff: First Peoples Bank of Tennessee
Defendant: SimplyBank.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00252
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Crytzer
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT To Magistrate Judge by SimplyBank. (Cannon, Wade)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 7/19/21. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by SimplyBank.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Cannon, Wade)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas H Dickenson on behalf of First Peoples Bank of Tennessee (Dickenson, Thomas)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 7/13/2021. (AWS)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 7/13/2021. (AWS)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 7/13/2021. (AWS)
July 13, 2021 District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AWS)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by SimplyBank.. (Cannon, Wade)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal by SimplyBank.. (Cannon, Wade)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit, case number 2-124-21. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4785186), filed by SimplyBank.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Cannon, Wade)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Peoples Bank of Tennessee v. SimplyBank.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SimplyBank.
Represented By: Wade K Cannon
Represented By: Sam D Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Peoples Bank of Tennessee
Represented By: James Frederick Parker
Represented By: Thomas H Dickenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?