Cox v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Micah Cox
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2021cv00253
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Micah Cox. United States Attorney served on 8/24/21. (ADA)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Micah Cox. United States Attorney General served on 8/24/2021. (ADA)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Micah Cox. Office of Regional Chief Counsel served on 8/24/2021. (ADA)
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney General, #2 Summons SSA)(JBR)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 7/16/21. (JBR)
July 14, 2021 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AML)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Micah Cox. (Webb, Emma)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Micah Cox. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil cover sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Webb, Emma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah Cox
Represented By: Emma Drozdowski Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?