Bullard v. Commissioner of Social Security (TV2)
Plaintiff: Tiffany Bullard
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2021cv00254
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Bullard. United States Attorney served on 8/24/21. (ADA)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Bullard. United States Attorney General served on 8/24/2021. (ADA)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Bullard. Office of Regional Chief Counsel served on 8/24/2021. (ADA)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE re IFP Service (Attorney Representation) (ABF)
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons US Attorney General)(ABF)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk issue summons and the United States Marshal, or the plaintiff, shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order upon all defendant(s) as directed by the plaintiff. If the United States Marshal provides the service, all costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. If the plaintiff provides his/her own service, the plaintiff will bear his/her own costs. Plaintiff is hereby put ON NOTICE that failure to serve the defendant(s) in the time required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) may result in this action being dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 7/19/21. (ABF)
July 13, 2021 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (CNC)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tiffany Bullard. (Webb, Emma)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Tiffany Bullard. (Attachments: #1 Other civil cover sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Webb, Emma) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/15/2021) (CNC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullard v. Commissioner of Social Security (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Bullard
Represented By: Emma Drozdowski Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?