Fountain Equipment Finance, LLC (JRG2)
Plaintiff: Fountain Equipment Finance, LLC and Fountain Leasing LLC
Defendant: Alex Lyon & Son Sales Managers and Auctioneers, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00297
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fountain Equipment Finance, LLC. Alex Lyon & Son Sales Managers and Auctioneers, Inc. served on 9/20/2021. (Tarpy, T)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/17/21. (KDO)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/17/21. (KDO)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/17/21. (KDO)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alex Lyon & Son Sales Managers and Auctioneers, Inc. (KDO)
August 16, 2021 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (KDO)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #2 Certificate of Corporate Interest, #1 Complaint, Summons in a Civil Action by Fountain Equipment Finance, LLC. (Tarpy, T)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Fountain Equipment Finance, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Smart Bank for Fountain Equipment Finance, LLC. (Tarpy, T)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex Lyon & Son Sales Managers and Auctioneers, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4815512.), filed by Fountain Equipment Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Tarpy, T) Modified on 8/17/2021 (KDO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fountain Equipment Finance, LLC (JRG2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fountain Equipment Finance, LLC
Represented By: T Lynn Tarpy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fountain Leasing LLC
Represented By: T Lynn Tarpy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Lyon & Son Sales Managers and Auctioneers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?