Buckmaster v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Holly Lynne Buckmaster
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Commissioner of Social Security and Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2021cv00303
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby Ordered to register as an E-filer using the following link:#https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 10/7/2021. (Steger, Christopher)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney on 8/30/2021, filed by Holly Lynne Buckmaster. (Osterhout, Karl)
September 2, 2021 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (ABF)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RELATING CASES. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to Case No. 1:18-cv-135. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. See E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3)(A)(1). Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Thomas W. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Christopher H. Steger, this case will also be assigned to Magistrate Judge Steger and a District Judge chosen through the Court's random selection process. However, consolidation is not ordered. This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 9/1/2021. (Steger, Christopher)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (SAC)
August 26, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4825083.) filed by Holly Lynne Buckmaster as to Holly Lynne Buckmaster (SAC)
August 26, 2021 Case has been sent to US Magistrate Judge Christopher H. Steger for possible case relation to 1-18-cv-135, Buckmaster v. SSA. (SAC)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4825083.) by Holly Lynne Buckmaster. (Attachments: #1 CGS PA Supreme Court, #2 CGS WD PA, #3 Proposed Order)(Osterhout, Karl)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4825064.), filed by Holly Lynne Buckmaster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to U.S. Attorney, #3 Summons to OGC, #4 Summons to Attorney General)(Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckmaster v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Lynne Buckmaster
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?