Tennessee et al v. United States Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: State of Tennessee, Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arizona, State of, Arkansas, State of, Georgia, State of, Idaho, State of, Indiana, State of, Kansas, State of, Kentucky, Commonwealth of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, Ohio, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, West Virginia, State of, The State of Tennessee, The State of Alabama, The State of Alaska, The State of Arizona, The State of Arkansas, The State of Georgia, The State of Idaho, The State of Indiana, The State of Kansas, The Commonwealth of Kentucky, The State of Louisiana, The State of Mississippi, The State of Missouri, The State of Montana, The State of Nebraska, The State of Ohio, The State of Oklahoma, The State of South Carolina, The State of South Dakota and The State of West Virginia
Defendant: United States Department of Education, Miguel Cardona, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Charlotte Burrows, United States Department of Justice, Merrick Garland and Kristen Clarke
Intervenor Plaintiff: Association of Christian Schools International, A.S., C.F. and A.F.
Amicus Curiae: Women's Human Rights Campaign
Case Number: 3:2021cv00308
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs by Women's Human Rights Campaign. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief) (AYB)
October 27, 2021 Filing 67 MOTION for Mark Schirmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee paid $90: K3043596) by Women's Human Rights Campaign. (AYB)
October 27, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #67 MOTION for Mark Schirmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (AYB)
October 25, 2021 Filing 66 REPLY to Response to Motion re #51 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor-Plaintiffs filed by A.F., A.S., Association of Christian Schools International, C.F.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Statement of Interest, #2 Exhibit B - Karlan Memorandum re Bostock, #3 Affidavit C - Supplemental Declaration of David Balik)(Scruggs, Jonathan)
October 22, 2021 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Charlotte Burrows, Miguel Cardona, Kristen Clarke, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Merrick Garland, United States Department of Education, United States Department of Justice. (Drezner, Michael)
October 21, 2021 Filing 64 MOTION for Henry W. Frampton, IV, to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 paid: K3043571) by A.F., A.S., Association of Christian Schools International, C.F. (AYB)
October 21, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #64 MOTION for Henry W. Frampton, IV, to Appear Pro Hac Vice (AYB)
October 18, 2021 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor-Plaintiffs, #52 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Intervenor-Plaintiffs' Motion to Join Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction) filed by Charlotte Burrows, Miguel Cardona, Kristen Clarke, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Merrick Garland, United States Department of Education, United States Department of Justice. (Healy, Christopher)
October 18, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Drezner on behalf of All Defendants (Drezner, Michael)
October 18, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin M Tomlinson on behalf of All Defendants (Tomlinson, Martin)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 10/14/2021. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 10/14/2021 (KMK): copy mailed to Christiana Holcomb
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re #51 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor-Plaintiffs filed by C.F., A.F., Association of Christian Schools International, A.S. As requested by the parties, oral argument on the Motion to Intervene [Doc. 51] will be held on November 3, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. ET before the undersigned United States District Judge in Courtroom 3B at the U.S. Courthouse, 800 Market Street, Knoxville, Tennessee. The parties SHALL follow the standard briefing schedule as set forth in the Court's local rules. This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 10/13/21. (EES) Modified on 10/14/2021 (KMK): Copies mailed to: Benjamin M Flowers, Christian B Corrigan, Christiana M Holcomb, D John Sauer, Elizabeth B Murrill, J Emory Smith , Jr, J Scott St John, James A Campbell, Thomas M Fisher and W. Scott Zanzig
October 8, 2021 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by The Commonwealth of Kentucky, The State of Alabama, The State of Alaska, The State of Arizona, The State of Arkansas, The State of Georgia, The State of Idaho, The State of Indiana, The State of Kansas, The State of Louisiana, The State of Mississippi, The State of Missouri, The State of Montana, The State of Nebraska, The State of Ohio, The State of Oklahoma, The State of South Carolina, The State of South Dakota, The State of Tennessee, The State of West Virginia. (Cloutier, Matt)
October 8, 2021 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by The Commonwealth of Kentucky, The State of Alabama, The State of Alaska, The State of Arizona, The State of Arkansas, The State of Georgia, The State of Idaho, The State of Indiana, The State of Kansas, The State of Louisiana, The State of Mississippi, The State of Missouri, The State of Montana, The State of Nebraska, The State of Ohio, The State of Oklahoma, The State of South Carolina, The State of South Dakota, The State of Tennessee, The State of West Virginia. (Cloutier, Matt)
October 8, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ryan Bangert (Filing fee $90.00, Receipt #K3043495) by A.F., A.S., Association of Christian Schools International, C.F.. (JBR)
October 8, 2021 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christiana Holcomb (Filing fee $90.00, Receipt #K3043495) by A.F., A.S., Association of Christian Schools International, C.F.. (JBR)
October 8, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by C.F., A.F., Association of Christian Schools International, A.S., #55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by C.F., A.F., Association of Christian Schools International, A.S. (JBR)
October 6, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Scruggs on behalf of A.F., A.S., Association of Christian Schools International, C.F. (Scruggs, Jonathan)
October 4, 2021 Filing 53 Certificate of Corporate Interest by A.F., A.S., Association of Christian Schools International, C.F.. (Fox, W)
October 4, 2021 Filing 52 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Intervenor-Plaintiffs' Motion to Join Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction) by A.F., A.S., Association of Christian Schools International, C.F.. (Fox, W)
October 4, 2021 Filing 51 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor-Plaintiffs by Association of Christian Schools International, A.S., C.F., A.F.. (Attachments: #1 Other Memoradum in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Declaration of A.S., a minor in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Exhibit Ex B - Decaration of D.C., a minor in Support of Motion to Intervene, #4 Exhibit Ex C - Declaration of A.F., a minor, in Support of Motion to Intervene, #5 Exhibit Ex D - Declaration of David Balik in Support of Motion to Intervene, #6 Exhibit Ex E - Intervenor-Plaintiffs' Proposed Verified Complaint, #7 Exhibit Ex A to Verified Complaint, #8 Exhibit Ex B to Verified Complaint, #9 Exhibit Ex C to Verified Complaint)(Fox, W)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 9/27/2021. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
September 23, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Charlotte Burrows, Miguel Cardona, Kristen Clarke, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Merrick Garland, United States Department of Education, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Healy, Christopher)
September 23, 2021 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Charlotte Burrows, Miguel Cardona, Kristen Clarke, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Merrick Garland, United States Department of Education, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Healy, Christopher)
September 22, 2021 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Elizabeth Murrill (Filing fee $ 90.) by The State of Louisiana. (KFB)
September 22, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Joseph St. John (Filing fee $ 90.) by The State of Louisiana. (KFB)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 9/22/2021. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 9/22/2021 to note copy mail to attorney West (AYB).
September 22, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney St. John (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The State of Louisiana, #47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Murrill (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The State of Louisiana as to The State of Louisiana. (KFB)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #41 Joint Motion for approval of stipulated briefing schedule. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 9/14/21. (KFB) Modified on 9/14/2021 (KFB). Copies mailed to attorneys Bowdre, Alloway, Sauer, See, Manley, Bronni, West and Wagner.
September 14, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Zach West (Filing fee $90.00, Receipt #K3043334) by The State of Oklahoma. (JBR)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 9/14/2021. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 9/14/2021 to note copies mailed to attorneys Bowdre, Alloway, Sauer, See, Manley, Bronni, and Wagner) (AYB).
September 14, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The State of Oklahoma (JBR)
September 13, 2021 Filing 41 Joint MOTION for approval of stipulated briefing schedule and to enlarge page limits and notice of proposed hearing dates by The Commonwealth of Kentucky, The State of Alabama, The State of Alaska, The State of Arizona, The State of Arkansas, The State of Georgia, The State of Idaho, The State of Indiana, The State of Kansas, The State of Louisiana, The State of Mississippi, The State of Missouri, The State of Montana, The State of Nebraska, The State of Ohio, The State of Oklahoma, The State of South Carolina, The State of South Dakota, The State of Tennessee, The State of West Virginia. (Cloutier, Matt)
September 13, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 K3043322.) by The State of Arkansas. (ABF)
September 13, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3043322.) by The State of Arkansas. (ABF)
September 13, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3043320.) by The Commonwealth of Kentucky. (ABF)
September 13, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3043312.) by The State of West Virginia. (ABF)
September 13, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3043324.) by The State of Missouri. (ABF)
September 13, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 K3043323.) by The State of Alaska. (ABF)
September 13, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3043325.) by The State of Alabama. (ABF)
September 13, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Healy on behalf of All Defendants (Healy, Christopher)
September 13, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The State of Missouri, #35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The State of Alaska, #34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The State of Alabama, #39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The State of Arkansas, #38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The Commonwealth of Kentucky, #40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The State of Arkansas, #37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The State of West Virginia (ABF)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 9/10/2021. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 9/13/2021 to indicate c/m to Christian B Corrigan, Office of the Attorney General (MT), 215 North Sanders, Helena, MT 59620 (ABF).
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 9/10/2021. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 9/13/2021 to note copy mailed to attorneys Flowers, Waldbeser, Sawyer, and Zanzig) (AYB).
September 10, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE by The Commonwealth of Kentucky, The State of Alabama, The State of Alaska, The State of Arizona, The State of Arkansas, The State of Georgia, The State of Idaho, The State of Indiana, The State of Kansas, The State of Louisiana, The State of Mississippi, The State of Missouri, The State of Montana, The State of Nebraska, The State of Ohio, The State of Oklahoma, The State of South Carolina, The State of South Dakota, The State of Tennessee, The State of West Virginia OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Other Proof-of-service forms)(Cloutier, Matt)
September 10, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Good Standing by The State of Georgia re #16 MOTION for Drew Waldbeser to Appear Pro Hac Vice (AYB)
September 10, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for W. Scott Zanzig to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 paid: K3043305) by The State of Idaho. (AYB)
September 10, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #28 MOTION for W. Scott Zanzig to Appear Pro Hac Vice (AYB)
September 10, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #16 MOTION for Drew Waldbeser to Appear Pro Hac Vice (AYB)
September 8, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Kate Sawyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3043273.) by The State of Arizona. (ABF)
September 8, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Christian Corrigan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3043272.) by The State of Montana. (ABF)
September 8, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Benjamin Flowers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3043271.) by The State of Ohio. (ABF)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 9/8/2021. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 9/8/2021 to indicate c/m to these 4 attorneys that have been granted phv admission (ABF).
September 8, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The State of Ohio, #26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The State of Montana (ABF)
September 8, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The State of Arizona (ABF)
September 7, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Justin L. Matheny (Filing fee $ 90 - K3043269) by The State of Mississippi. (RLK)
September 7, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason Ravnsborg (Filing fee $ 90 - K3043266) by The State of South Dakota. (RLK)
September 7, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James A. Campbell (Filing fee $ 90 - Receipt K3043268) by The State of Nebraska. (RLK)
September 7, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney J Emory Smith (Filing fee $ 90 - Receipt K3043627) by The State of South Carolina. (RLK)
September 7, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua E Gardner on behalf of All Defendants (Gardner, Joshua)
September 7, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The State of Mississippi, #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The State of South Carolina, #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The State of Nebraska, #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The State of South Dakota (RLK)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 9/3/2021. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
September 3, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #16 MOTION for Leave for Drew F Waldbeser to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 paid) : no certificate of good standing submitted(ADA)
September 3, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave for Drew F. Waldbeser to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 paid receipt K3043245) by The State of Georgia. (no certificate attached) (ADA)
September 3, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave for Kurtis K. Wiard to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 paid K3043246) by The State of Kansas. (ADA)
September 3, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave for Sarah K. Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The State of Tennessee. (pending admission) (ADA)
September 3, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave for Clark Hildabrand to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The State of Tennessee. (pending admission) (ADA)
September 3, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave for Brandon James Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The State of Tennessee. (pending admission) (ADA)
September 3, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave for Brandon James Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by The State of Tennessee (ADA)
September 3, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #14 MOTION for Leave for Sarah K. Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by The State of Tennessee (ADA)
September 3, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #15 MOTION for Leave for Kurtis K Wiard to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 paid) filed by The State of Kansas (ADA)
September 3, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #13 MOTION for Leave for Clark Hildabrand to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by The State of Tennessee (ADA)
September 2, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Howard H. Eley, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Emily House, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Eve Carney, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Josh Mason, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen C. Raymer)(Cloutier, Matt)
September 2, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by The Commonwealth of Kentucky, The State of Alabama, The State of Alaska, The State of Arizona, The State of Arkansas, The State of Georgia, The State of Idaho, The State of Indiana, The State of Kansas, The State of Louisiana, The State of Mississippi, The State of Missouri, The State of Montana, The State of Nebraska, The State of Ohio, The State of Oklahoma, The State of South Carolina, The State of South Dakota, The State of Tennessee, The State of West Virginia. (Cloutier, Matt)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 9/1/2021. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3043226.) by The State of Indiana. (ABF)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 8/31/2021. (JCK)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 8/31/2021. (JCK)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 8/31/2021. (JCK)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Charlotte Burrows, Miguel Cardona, Kristen Clarke, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Merrick Garland, United States Department of Education, United States Department of Justice, and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons Miguel Cordona, #2 Summons Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, #3 Summons Charlotte Burrows, #4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice, #5 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #6 Summons Kristen Clarke)(JCK)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Attorneys Sara K. Campbell, Clark L. Hildabrand, Brandon J. Smith, A. Barrett Bowdre, Cori M. Mills, Kate B. Sawyer, Nicholas J.Bronni, Vincent Wagner, Drew F. Waldbeser, W. Scott Zanzig, Thomas M. Fisher, Kurtis K. Wiard, Marc Manley Courtney Albini, Elzabeth B. Murrill, J. Scott St. John, Justin Matheny, D. John Sauer, Davis M.S. Dewhirst, Christian B. Corrigan,James B. Campbell, Benjamin M. Flowers, Zach West, J. Emory Smith, Jr. Jason R. Ravnsborg, Lindsay S. See are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vic (Copy of Notice mailed to all deficient attorneys)(JCK)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (PDF) re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet was filed in a fillable format (JCK)
August 31, 2021 District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JCK)
August 31, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by The State of Indiana (ABF)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4829401.), filed by Louisiana, State of, Idaho, State of, Oklahoma, State of, Alabama, State of, State of Tennessee, South Carolina, State of, Ohio, State of, Missouri, State of, Georgia, State of, Alaska, State of, Kansas, State of, Mississippi, State of, West Virginia, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, Indiana, State of, Arizona, State of, South Dakota, State of, Kentucky, Commonwealth of, Arkansas, State of. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Other Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)(Cloutier, Matt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennessee et al v. United States Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Matt Daniel Cloutier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentucky, Commonwealth of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mississippi, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Dakota, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Tennessee
Represented By: Brandon James Smith
Represented By: Clark Lassiter Hildabrand
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Represented By: Matt Daniel Cloutier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Alabama
Represented By: Alexander Barrett Bowdre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Alaska
Represented By: Jessica M Alloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Arizona
Represented By: Kate B Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Arkansas
Represented By: Nicholas J Bronni
Represented By: Vincent M Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Georgia
Represented By: Drew F Waldbeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Idaho
Represented By: W. Scott Zanzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Indiana
Represented By: Thomas M Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Kansas
Represented By: Kurtis K Wiard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Marc Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Louisiana
Represented By: Elizabeth B Murrill
Represented By: J Scott St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Mississippi
Represented By: Justin L Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Missouri
Represented By: D John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Montana
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Represented By: Davis M S DeWhirst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Nebraska
Represented By: James A Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Ohio
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Zach Paul West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of South Carolina
Represented By: J Emory Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of South Dakota
Represented By: Jason R Ravnsborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of West Virginia
Represented By: Lindsay S See
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Represented By: Christopher Healy
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Represented By: Martin M Tomlinson
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Cardona
Represented By: Christopher Healy
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Represented By: Martin M Tomlinson
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Christopher Healy
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Represented By: Martin M Tomlinson
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Burrows
Represented By: Christopher Healy
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Represented By: Martin M Tomlinson
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Christopher Healy
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Represented By: Martin M Tomlinson
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Christopher Healy
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Represented By: Martin M Tomlinson
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: Christopher Healy
Represented By: Joshua E Gardner
Represented By: Martin M Tomlinson
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Association of Christian Schools International
Represented By: Christiana M. Holcomb
Represented By: Jonathan Scruggs
Represented By: Ryan L Bangert
Represented By: W Andrew Fox
Represented By: Henry W. Frampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: A.S.
Represented By: Christiana M. Holcomb
Represented By: Jonathan Scruggs
Represented By: Ryan L Bangert
Represented By: W Andrew Fox
Represented By: Henry W. Frampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: C.F.
Represented By: Christiana M. Holcomb
Represented By: Jonathan Scruggs
Represented By: Ryan L Bangert
Represented By: W Andrew Fox
Represented By: Henry W. Frampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: A.F.
Represented By: Christiana M. Holcomb
Represented By: Jonathan Scruggs
Represented By: Ryan L Bangert
Represented By: W Andrew Fox
Represented By: Henry W. Frampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Women's Human Rights Campaign
Represented By: Mark Schirmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?