King v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Benjamin B King
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00320
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Crytzer
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Benjamin B King. Prudential Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 11/4/2021. (Dreiser, John)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin B King. Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 9/22/2021. (Dreiser, John)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 9/10/21. (ABF)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 9/10/21. (ABF)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 9/10/21. (ABF)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America. (ABF)
September 10, 2021 District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4838523.), filed by Benjamin B King. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Other civil cover sheet)(Dreiser, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin B King
Represented By: John P Dreiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?