United States of America v. A 2020 SALEM 29VBUD TRAVEL TRAILER, VIN# 4X4TSME27LA326167, REGISTERED TO SARRAH WILLHITE et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: A 2020 SALEM 29VBUD TRAVEL TRAILER, VIN# 4X4TSME27LA326167, REGISTERED TO SARRAH WILLHITE and REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 265 MIDNIGHT WAY, PARROTTSVILLE, TENNESSEE 37843
Case Number: 3:2022cv00141
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1341 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Nugent on behalf of United States of America (Nugent, Daniel)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Court finds the request well taken and it is therefore GRANTED. The STAY in this matter is hereby EXTENDED for the present time. The United States SHALL FILE a status report providing an update on the status of the pending criminal matter on or before April 19, 2023. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/23/2023. (CAT)
January 19, 2023 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Swafford, Russ)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The STAY in this matter is hereby EXTENDED for an additional 90 days. The United States SHALL FILE a status report providing an update on the status of the pending criminal matter on or before January 19, 2023. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/25/2022. (AMP)
October 18, 2022 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Swafford, Russ)
October 18, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Russ Swafford on behalf of United States of America (Swafford, Russ)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Status Report filed by United States of America. Pursuant to the Courts order dated April 22, 2022 [Doc. 9], the United States of America has filed a status report requesting an extension of the stay in this matter for an additional ninety (90) days). For cause, the United States explains that the related criminal case and investigation remains ongoing, therefore the circumstances under which the Court stayed the instant case remains unchanged. The Court finds the request well taken and it is therefore GRANTED. The STAY in this matter is hereby EXTENDED until the related criminal investigation has been concluded, and any resulting criminal action has been disposed of at the trial court level. The United States SHALL FILE a status report providing an update on the status of the pending criminal matter on or before October 21, 2022. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 7/25/2022. (LCK)
July 20, 2022 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Svolto, Anne-Marie)
July 20, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne-Marie Svolto on behalf of United States of America (Svolto, Anne-Marie)
April 22, 2022 Filing 11 SEALED Document re: #1 Complaint by United States of America. (CAT)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 04/22/2022. (CAT)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court finds the Government's motion to stay [Doc. 5] well taken, and it is therefore GRANTED. This action is hereby STAYED until the related criminal investigation has been concluded, and any resulting criminal action has been disposed of at the trial court level. The United States shall file a status report providing the Court with an update on the status of the pending criminal matter every 90 days beginning July 20, 2022. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 04/22/2022. (CAT)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 4/19/22. (JBR)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 4/19/22. (JBR)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 4/19/22. (JBR)
April 19, 2022 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JBR)
April 18, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceeding by United States of America. (Mohr, Gretchen)
April 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Mohr, Gretchen)
April 18, 2022 Filing 3 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by United States of America . (Mohr, Gretchen)
April 18, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by United States of America. (Mohr, Gretchen)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Other / Civil Cover Sheet)(Mohr, Gretchen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. A 2020 SALEM 29VBUD TRAVEL TRAILER, VIN# 4X4TSME27LA326167, REGISTERED TO SARRAH WILLHITE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gretchen Jenkins Mohr
Represented By: Daniel Nugent
Represented By: Anne-Marie Svolto
Represented By: Russ Swafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2020 SALEM 29VBUD TRAVEL TRAILER, VIN# 4X4TSME27LA326167, REGISTERED TO SARRAH WILLHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 265 MIDNIGHT WAY, PARROTTSVILLE, TENNESSEE 37843
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?