Rasco et al v. BTI Tools, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brey C Rasco and Twyla Rasco
Defendant: BTI Tools, LLC, Smith & Wesson, Inc, Smith and Wesson Brands, Inc, AOB Products Company doing business as Battenfeld Technologies, Inc, American Outdoor Brands, Inc., Rural King Administration, Inc, Rural King C, Inc, RKDS, LLC, Rural King Distribution and Management, Inc, Rural King Holding Co and RK Holdings, LLP
Case Number: 3:2022cv00149
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Crytzer
Referring Judge: Jill E McCook
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. The Parties are hereby ORDERED to confer and submit the required Rule 26(f) report to the Court on or before June 30, 2022. The Court will determine whether to hold a Rule 16 scheduling conference after receiving the Parties' Rule 26(f) report. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 06/16/2022. This docket entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (SRO)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, the Court grants the Parties' motion #16 as construed under Rule 21 and DROPS Defendants Smith & Wesson, Inc. and Smith and Wesson Brands, Inc. from this action. Signed by District Judge Katherine A. Crytzer on 6/16/22. (ADA)
June 15, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal party Smith & Wesson, Inc., Smith and Wesson Brands, Inc. by AOB Products Company, American Outdoor Brands, Inc., BTI Tools, LLC, RK Holdings, LLP, RKDS, LLC, Rural King Administration, Inc, Rural King C, Inc, Rural King Distribution and Management, Inc, Rural King Holding Co. (Fraser, Brad)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 6/7/22. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (JBR)
June 6, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Smith & Wesson, Inc, Smith and Wesson Brands, Inc.(Fraser, Brad)
June 6, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by RK Holdings, LLP, RKDS, LLC, Rural King Administration, Inc, Rural King C, Inc, Rural King Distribution and Management, Inc, Rural King Holding Co.(Fraser, Brad)
June 6, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by AOB Products Company, American Outdoor Brands, Inc., BTI Tools, LLC.(Fraser, Brad)
May 6, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION pursuant to LR 12.1(a) by AOB Products Company, American Outdoor Brands, Inc., BTI Tools, LLC, RK Holdings, LLP, RKDS, LLC, Rural King Administration, Inc, Rural King C, Inc, Rural King Distribution and Management, Inc, Rural King Holding Co. (Fraser, Brad)
May 3, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #6 Order, . (Fraser, Brad)
April 29, 2022 Filing 9 Consent and Joinder to Notice of Removal by AOB Products Company, American Outdoor Brands, Inc. (Wolfe, Joshua) Modified on 5/4/2022 to term as a motion (AYB).
April 29, 2022 Filing 8 Consent and Joinder to Notice of Removal by RK Holdings, LLP, RKDS, LLC, Rural King Administration, Inc, Rural King C, Inc, Rural King Distribution and Management, Inc, Rural King Holding Co. (Wolfe, Joshua) Modified on 5/4/2022 to term as a motion (AYB).
April 29, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Consent and Joinder to Notice of Removal from Sevier County Circuit Court, case number 22-CV-165-III. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5048737), filed by Smith & Wesson, Inc, Smith and Wesson Brands, Inc.(Wolfe, Joshua)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING JURISDICTION. The Court ORDERS Defendant BTI Tools, LLC to file a response to this Order on or before May 4, 2022, with facts sufficient to show that this Court has jurisdiction over the case. A failure to respond will be grounds for the Court to dismiss this action. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on April 27, 2022. (AYB)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 04/26/2022. (AMP)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 04/26/2022. (AMP)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 04/26/2022. (AMP)
April 26, 2022 District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (AMP)
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by BTI Tools, LLC identifying Corporate Parent American Outdoor Brands, Inc. for BTI Tools, LLC. (Fraser, Brad)
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sevier Circut, case number 22-CV-165-III. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5043265), filed by BTI Tools, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court File)(Fraser, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasco et al v. BTI Tools, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTI Tools, LLC
Represented By: Brad A Fraser
Represented By: Ethan Daniel Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Wesson, Inc
Represented By: Brad A Fraser
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith and Wesson Brands, Inc
Represented By: Brad A Fraser
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AOB Products Company doing business as Battenfeld Technologies, Inc
Represented By: Brad A Fraser
Represented By: Ethan Daniel Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Outdoor Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Brad A Fraser
Represented By: Ethan Daniel Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rural King Administration, Inc
Represented By: Brad A Fraser
Represented By: Ethan Daniel Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rural King C, Inc
Represented By: Brad A Fraser
Represented By: Ethan Daniel Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RKDS, LLC
Represented By: Brad A Fraser
Represented By: Ethan Daniel Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rural King Distribution and Management, Inc
Represented By: Brad A Fraser
Represented By: Ethan Daniel Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rural King Holding Co
Represented By: Brad A Fraser
Represented By: Ethan Daniel Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RK Holdings, LLP
Represented By: Brad A Fraser
Represented By: Ethan Daniel Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brey C Rasco
Represented By: Denise S Terry
Represented By: Tracey Dillon Parker, I
Represented By: Gabriel Charles Stapleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twyla Rasco
Represented By: Denise S Terry
Represented By: Gabriel Charles Stapleton
Represented By: Tracey Dillon Parker, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?