United States of America v. $46,714.97 derived from 114 American Express Gift Cards, voluntarily relinquished by Andrew Assad (TV1)
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $46,714.97 derived from 114 American Express Gift Cards, voluntarily relinquished by Andrew Assad
Case Number: 3:2022cv00165
Filed: May 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1341 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Filing 12 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date June 12, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A / Advertisement Certification Report, #2 Exhibit B / Advertisement Copy)(Mohr, Gretchen)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Consent is GRANTED, DONE and ORDERED in the Eastern District of Tennessee on this 31st day of May 2022. There being no further issues before the Court, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to CLOSE the case. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/31/22. (JBR)
May 18, 2022 Filing 10 *Entered In Error - Please Disregard*Administrative Notice to Counsel re: #7 Proposed ORDER ON CONSENT TO CIVIL FORFEITURE to #1 Complaint requirement due by 5/23/2022. (BJL) Modified on 5/19/2022 (BJL).
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that this case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Debra C. Poplin, United States Magistrate Judge, to handle any matters routinely considered by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and the Rules of this Court. Signed by Chief District Judge Travis R McDonough on 5/17/2022. (BJL)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 5/16/2022. (KMK)
May 13, 2022 Filing 7 Proposed ORDER ON CONSENT TO CIVIL FORFEITURE to #1 Complaint, #2 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Warrant Of Arrest In Rem To be Issued)(BJL) Modified on 5/13/2022 (BJL).
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information, Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/13/2022. (BJL)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss, Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/13/2022. (BJL)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions, Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/13/2022. (BJL)
May 13, 2022 Error Docket Entry. Modified on 5/13/2022 (BJL).
May 13, 2022 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to $46,714.97 derived from 114 American Express Gift Cards, voluntarily relinquished by Andrew Assad.. (BJL)
May 12, 2022 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (BJL)
May 12, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by United States of America OF COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE (Mohr, Gretchen)
May 12, 2022 Filing 2 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (Consent to Civil Forfeiture) by United States of America. (Mohr, Gretchen)
May 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $46,714.97 derived from 114 American Express Gift Cards, voluntarily relinquished by Andrew Assad, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Verified Complaint In Rem, #2 Other / Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons / Arrest Warrant in Rem)(Mohr, Gretchen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $46,714.97 derived from 114 American Express Gift Cards, voluntarily relinquished by Andrew Assad (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gretchen Jenkins Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $46,714.97 derived from 114 American Express Gift Cards, voluntarily relinquished by Andrew Assad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?