Casella v. Sam's West, Inc
Plaintiff: Matthew Casella
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc
Case Number: 3:2023cv00102
Filed: March 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Jill E McCook
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Sheehan on behalf of Matthew Casella (Sheehan, Spencer)
March 24, 2023 Filing 8 Certificate of Citizenship by Matthew Casella. (Snyder, Brent)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 3/24/2023. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 3/27/2023 to indicate c/m to Spencer Sheehan, Sheehan & Associates, P.C., 60 Cuttermill Rd, Suite 412, Great Neck, NY 11021 (ABF).
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information,Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/23/2023. (BJL)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss, Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/23/2023. (BJL)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information,Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/23/2023. (BJL)
March 23, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sam's West, Inc. (BJL)
March 23, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5330415.) by Matthew Casella. (Snyder, Brent)
March 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sam's West, Inc ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5329943.), filed by Matthew Casella. (Attachments: #1 Other civil cover sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Snyder, Brent)
March 23, 2023 District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (BJL)
March 23, 2023 NOTICE and Orders( Doc Nos 4-6)- mailed to Spencer Sheehan Sheehan & Associates, P.C. 60 Cuttermill Rd Suite 412 Great Neck, NY 11021 (BJL) Modified on 3/23/2023 (BJL).
March 23, 2023 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by Matthew Casella. (BJL)
March 23, 2023 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5330415.) filed by Matthew Casella (BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casella v. Sam's West, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Casella
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Represented By: Brent S Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?