US Framing International, LLC v. Continental Building Company et al
Plaintiff: US Framing International, LLC
Defendant: Continental Building Company, Rick Adante, Todd Alexander, Brent Baker, Chris Italiano, Gregory Ray and Paul Soha
Case Number: 3:2023cv00249
Filed: July 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on September 8, 2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent / Non-consent) (AYB)
September 7, 2023 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rick Adante, Todd Alexander, Brent Baker, Continental Building Company, Chris Italiano, Gregory Ray, Paul Soha. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Federal Case Pleadings)(Whitt, William)
September 7, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Rick Adante, Todd Alexander, Brent Baker, Continental Building Company, Chris Italiano, Gregory Ray, Paul Soha. (Whitt, William)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 8/24/2023. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
August 23, 2023 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #14 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Kalson, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5453016.) filed by Paul Soha, Chris Italiano, Rick Adante, Brent Baker, Todd Alexander, Continental Building Company, Gregory Ray (ABF)
August 22, 2023 Filing 14 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Kalson, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5453016.) by Rick Adante, Todd Alexander, Brent Baker, Continental Building Company, Chris Italiano, Gregory Ray, Paul Soha. (Whitt, William)
August 17, 2023 Filing 13 Now before the Court is Defendants' Motion for An Initial Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law [Doc. 11]. In light of no objection [see Doc. 12], and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion [Doc. 11]. Defendants SHALL file their response to the Complaint on or before September 7, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 8/17/2023. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.). (AGA)
August 16, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, or Otherwise Plead in Response filed by US Framing International, LLC. (Thomas, Daniel)
August 15, 2023 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, or Otherwise Plead in Response by Rick Adante, Todd Alexander, Brent Baker, Continental Building Company, Chris Italiano, Gregory Ray, Paul Soha. (Whitt, William)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Stay. However, theCourt will address the needs in the motion to stay at the scheduling conference in this matter. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/3/2023. (DJH)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 7/28/23. (ABF)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 7/28/23. (ABF)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/28/23. (ABF)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to US Framing International LLC v. Continental Building Company, et al., No. 3:21-CV-174, which was closed on November 4, 2021 [Docs. 30, 31]. Specifically, these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. See E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3)(A)(2). Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Travis R. McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin, this case will also be assigned to District Judge Travis R. McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 7/28/23. (ABF)
July 28, 2023 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF)
July 14, 2023 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION to Stay filed by Rick Adante, Todd Alexander, Brent Baker, Continental Building Company, Chris Italiano, Gregory Ray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Whitt, William)
July 14, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay by Rick Adante, Todd Alexander, Brent Baker, Continental Building Company, Chris Italiano, Gregory Ray, Paul Soha. (Whitt, William)
July 14, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Continental Building Company. (Whitt, William)
July 14, 2023 Filing 2 Certificate of Citizenship by Rick Adante, Todd Alexander, Brent Baker, Continental Building Company, Chris Italiano, Gregory Ray, Paul Soha. (Whitt, William)
July 14, 2023 Case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Poplin for related case determination. (JCK)
July 14, 2023 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by Rick Adante, Todd Alexander, Brent Baker, Continental Building Company, Chris Italiano, Gregory Ray, Paul Soha. (JCK)
July 12, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County, TN Chancery Court, case number 206699-1. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5417884), filed by Chris Italiano, Rick Adante, Gregory Ray, Continental Building Company, Paul Soha, Todd Alexander, Brent Baker. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Whitt, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Framing International, LLC v. Continental Building Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Framing International, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Thomas
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Doiron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Building Company
Represented By: William Paul Whitt
Represented By: Richard D Kalson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Adante
Represented By: William Paul Whitt
Represented By: Richard D Kalson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Alexander
Represented By: William Paul Whitt
Represented By: Richard D Kalson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Baker
Represented By: William Paul Whitt
Represented By: Richard D Kalson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Italiano
Represented By: William Paul Whitt
Represented By: Richard D Kalson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Ray
Represented By: William Paul Whitt
Represented By: Richard D Kalson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Soha
Represented By: William Paul Whitt
Represented By: Richard D Kalson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?