Phillips v. Consolidated Nuclear Security, LLC
Plaintiff: Christopher Allen Phillips
Defendant: Consolidated Nuclear Security, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00337
Filed: September 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Jill E McCook
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/11/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 420 - Greeneville before District Judge Clifton L Corker. The estimated length of trial is three (3) days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2025 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 420 - Greeneville before District Judge Clifton L Corker. Motions due by 10/15/2024. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/31/2023. (LCK)
October 27, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Consolidated Nuclear Security, LLC (Burgin, John)
October 27, 2023 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Burgin, John)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/27/23. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (JBR)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conference unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: 1. As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses.See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 09/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/ NonConsent) (CAT)
September 26, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Consolidated Nuclear Security, LLC.(Burgin, John)
September 20, 2023 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Consolidated Nuclear Security, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Leidos Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Leidos, Inc., Corporate Parent SOC LLC, Corporate Parent Day & Zimmerman Inc., Corporate Parent ATK Launch Systems, LLC., Corporate Parent Northrop Grumman Innovation Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Corporate Parent Northrop Grumman Corporation, Corporate Parent Bechtel National Inc for Consolidated Nuclear Security, LLC. (Burgin, John)
September 20, 2023 Filing 7 Certificate of Citizenship by Consolidated Nuclear Security, LLC. (Burgin, John)
September 20, 2023 Filing 6 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Notice of Removal : Please refile Notice of Citizenship and Certificate of Corporate Interest using the events Certificate of Citizenship and Certificate of Corporate Interest found Other Documents. Requirements due by 9/25/2023. (CAT)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 09/20/2023. (CAT)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 09/20/2023. (CAT)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 09/20/2023. (CAT)
September 20, 2023 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (CAT)
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by Consolidated Nuclear Security, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Service on Counsel for Plaintiff (Burgin, John)
September 19, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anderson County Chancery Court, case number 23CH5290. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5475329), filed by Consolidated Nuclear Security, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Filing Removal, #2 Exhibit B State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit B Return on State Court Summons, #5 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Other CNS Corporate Disclosure)(Burgin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Consolidated Nuclear Security, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Allen Phillips
Represented By: Dail R Cantrell
Represented By: Daniel R Goodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Nuclear Security, LLC
Represented By: John E Winters
Represented By: Kristi McKinney Stogsdill
Represented By: John Burgin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?