Moore et al v. Knox County et al
Plaintiff: Rex Allen Moore and Deanna Moore
Defendant: Knox County, Knox County Schools Administration, Jon Rysewy, Kori Lauthner, Cindy Stanford, Belinda Holdernesse, Glynn Jacobs and Jon Rysewyk
Case Number: 3:2024cv00196
Filed: May 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #7 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. **SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY** Deanna Moore, as a named Plaintiff, must complete and sign an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (non-prisoner cases) located on our website at https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/application-proceed-forma-pauperis-non-prisoner-cases. Plaintiff Deanna Moore is DIRECTED to complete and file the form to cure this deficiency within twenty-one days (21) days from the date of this Order or otherwise pay the required filing fee. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff Deanna Moore a copy of the form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 6/14/2024. (Copy of Order and Motion for IFP form mailed to Deanna Moore). (LCK)
May 22, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Notice and Jury Demand by Rex Allen Moore. (MKM)
May 22, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rex Allen Moore. Two copies of Motion provided at counter and confirmed both were to be filed. (Attachments: #1 Other Copy of Order #7 , #2 Other SSA Benefit Verification Letter)(MKM)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rex Allen Moore. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form for Prisoner Cases) [Doc. 2] is not the proper form. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to use the form Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (non-prisoner cases) located on our website at https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/application-proceed-forma-pauperis-non-prisoner-cases. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a copy of the form. Also, Plaintiff Deanna Moore will need to complete the same form and is DIRECTED to use the form Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (non-prisoner cases) located on our website at https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/application-proceed-forma-pauperis-non-prisoner-cases. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a copy of the form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 05/06/2024. (Copy of Order and Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (non-prisoner) mailed to Rex Allen Moore and Deanna Moore) (CAT) Modified on 5/6/2024 (CAT).
May 3, 2024 Filing 6 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. c/m Rex and Deanna Moore, 2112 Washington Ave, Knoxville, TN 37917. (MKM)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. c/m Rex and Deanna Moore, 2112 Washington Ave, Knoxville, TN 37917. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 5/3/2024. (MKM)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. c/m Rex and Deanna Moore, 2112 Washington Ave, Knoxville, TN 37917. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 5/3/2024. (MKM)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. c/m Rex and Deanna Moore, 2112 Washington Ave, Knoxville, TN 37917. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 5/3/2024. (MKM) Modified text on 5/3/2024 (MKM).
May 2, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Rex Moore by Rex Allen Moore. (MKM)
May 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Deanna Moore, Rex Allen Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Knox County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Allen Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox County Schools Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Rysewy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kori Lauthner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Holdernesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glynn Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Rysewyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?