Small v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Sheena Small
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of the General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2024cv00500
Filed: December 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Commencement of Social Security Action re #1 SSA COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (KMK)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 12/30/2024. (KMK)
December 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 12/29/2024. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN)
December 23, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Antolic Gross on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Gross, Nicole)
December 23, 2024 District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF)
December 23, 2024 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5865820.) filed by Sheena Small (ABF)
December 20, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5865820.) by Sheena Small. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Konoski, Bryan) Modified on 12/23/2024 - The Certificate is more than 30 days old, but the Clerk's office has verified his admission with the USDC Southern NY (ABF).
December 20, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sheena Small. (Konoski, Bryan)
December 20, 2024 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Sheena Small. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Konoski, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Small v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheena Small
Represented By: Bryan Konoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Nicole Antolic Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of the General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?