Francisco v. Crescent Runners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Moises Francisco
Defendant: Crescent Runners, LLC, Vanhorn Trucking, LLC, Albert Williams, Underwriters at Lloyd London, Sutton Specialty Insurance Company and The General Automobile Insurance Co Inc.
Case Number: 3:2025cv00021
Filed: January 17, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jill E McCook
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2025 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Vanhorn Trucking, LLC.(Lavelle, Ethan)
March 14, 2025 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Crescent Runners, LLC.(Lavelle, Ethan)
March 10, 2025 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sutton Specialty Insurance Company.(Byron, Matthew)
February 26, 2025 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The General Automobile Insurance Co Inc..(Rhodes, Scott)
February 25, 2025 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Thomas Byron on behalf of Sutton Specialty Insurance Company (Byron, Matthew)
February 24, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A Rhodes on behalf of The General Automobile Insurance Co Inc. (Rhodes, Scott)
February 21, 2025 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Additional Time to Respond by Crescent Runners, LLC, Vanhorn Trucking, LLC. (Wolfe, Joshua)
February 18, 2025 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moises Francisco. The General Automobile Insurance Co Inc. served on 2/4/2025 through the TN Dept of Commerce and Insurance. (ABF)
February 12, 2025 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moises Francisco. Sutton Specialty Insurance Company served on 1/29/2025 through the TN Dept of Commerce and Insurance. (ABF)
February 12, 2025 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moises Francisco. The General Automobile Insurance Co Inc. served on 1/29/2025 through the TN Dept of Commerce and Insurance. (ABF)
January 24, 2025 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Moises Francisco. (Tanner, James)
January 17, 2025 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Crescent Runners, LLC, Vanhorn Trucking, LLC, Albert Williams, Underwriters at Lloyd London, Sutton Specialty Insurance Company, and The General Automobile Insurance Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Vanhorn Trucking, #2 Summons Albert Williams, #3 Summons Underwriters at Lloyd London, #4 Summons Sutton Specialty Insurance Company, #5 The General Automobile Insurance Co Inc.) (JGF)
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 01/17/2025. (JGF)
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 01/17/2025. (JGF)
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 01/17/2025. (JGF)
January 17, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency by Moises Francisco. Need to file required civil cover sheet. (JGF)
January 17, 2025 Filing 2 Certificate of Citizenship by Moises Francisco. (Tanner, James)
January 17, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5884262.), filed by Moises Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Tanner, James)
January 17, 2025 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (JGF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francisco v. Crescent Runners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Francisco
Represented By: James Curtis Tanner
Represented By: Michael Beehan
Represented By: Hamilton Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crescent Runners, LLC
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Represented By: Ethan Daniel Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanhorn Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Represented By: Ethan Daniel Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underwriters at Lloyd London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutton Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The General Automobile Insurance Co Inc.
Represented By: Scott A Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?