Yanina Kuksa, LLC et al v. Waller
Plaintiff: Yanina Kuksa, LLC and Transporters, LLC
Defendant: James B. Waller
Case Number: 3:2025cv00027
Filed: January 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Crytzer
Referring Judge: Jill E McCook
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lieutenant Brian Bumpus (Adkins, Terrill)
February 24, 2025 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Transporters, LLC, Yanina Kuksa, LLC. (Adkins, Terrill)
February 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file a response to this Order on or before 2/25/2025 with facts sufficient to show that this Court has jurisdiction over the action. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 2/21/2025. (MKM)
January 30, 2025 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Yanina Kuksa, LLC. (ABF)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 1/28/25. (ABF)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 1/28/25. (ABF)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 1/28/25. (ABF)
January 28, 2025 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel Terrill Adkins - Please file the civil cover sheet using the supplement event located under "Other Documents" - Requirements due by 2/3/2025. (ABF)
January 28, 2025 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to James B. Waller. (ABF)
January 28, 2025 District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (ABF)
January 28, 2025 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by Transporters, LLC, Yanina Kuksa, LLC. (ABF)
January 27, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Yanina Kuksa, LLC, Transporters, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons James B. Waller)(Adkins, Terrill)
January 27, 2025 Filing fee electronically received on 1/21/2025: $ 405.00, receipt number ATNEDC-5885961 (KMK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yanina Kuksa, LLC et al v. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yanina Kuksa, LLC
Represented By: Terrill L Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transporters, LLC
Represented By: Terrill L Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?