Clark v. Pilot Travel Centers LLC
Plaintiff: Darlene M. Clark
Defendant: Pilot Travel Centers LLC, John Emery and Bobby Fryar Trucking
Case Number: 3:2025cv00029
Filed: January 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jill E McCook
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER finding as moot #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Michael Crow was already admitted pro hac vice in this case [Doc. 16]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 03/12/2025. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN) c/m Michael J. Crow, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, PC, PO Box 4160, Montgomery, AL 36103 on 3/12/2025 (MKM).
March 11, 2025 Filing 22 NOTICE by Pilot Travel Centers LLC (Chapman, David)
March 11, 2025 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Chapman, David)
March 11, 2025 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of service of rule 26 disclosures by Stuart F James on behalf of Bobby Fryar Trucking, John Emery (James, Stuart)
March 10, 2025 Filing 19 NOTICE by Darlene M. Clark OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Ardis, Patrick)
March 7, 2025 Filing 18 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Pilot Travel Centers LLC (Chapman, David)
March 6, 2025 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Crow (Filing fee $ 150, receipt attached) by Darlene M. Clark. Certificate older than 30 days, good standing verified with the Middle District of Alabama. Clerk notes that Attorney Crow was already admitted PHV in this case on 3/4/2025. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope) (MKM)
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 03/04/2025. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN) c/m Michael J. Crow, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, PC, PO Box 4160, Montgomery, AL 36103 on 3/5/2025 (MKM).
February 28, 2025 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Crow (Filing fee $ 150, receipt attached) by Darlene M. Clark. (Attachments: #1 Other Receipt, #2 Other Envelope) (MKM)
February 28, 2025 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete as to Michael Crow regarding document: #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Darlene M. Clark (MKM)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/17/2026 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2026 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/19/2025. (MKM)
February 6, 2025 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to John Emery. (MKM)
February 5, 2025 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart F James on behalf of John Emery, Bobby Fryar Truckinjg (James, Stuart)
February 5, 2025 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, SUMMONS TO JOHN EMERY JR by Darlene M. Clark. (Ardis, Patrick)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/24/2025. (MKM)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 1/23/2025. (MKM)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/23/2025. (Attachments: #1 Other Consent Form) (MKM)
January 22, 2025 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Pilot Travel Centers LLC.(Chapman, David)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/22/2025. (MKM)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/22/2025. (MKM)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/22/2025. (MKM)
January 22, 2025 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (MKM)
January 21, 2025 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Pilot Travel Centers LLC. (Chapman, David)
January 21, 2025 Filing 2 Certificate of Citizenship by Pilot Travel Centers LLC. (Chapman, David)
January 21, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 28378. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5886906), filed by Pilot Travel Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B-Notice of Filing to State Court)(Chapman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Pilot Travel Centers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene M. Clark
Represented By: Patrick M Ardis
Represented By: Michael J. Crow
Represented By: Michael J. Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Travel Centers LLC
Represented By: David A. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Emery
Represented By: Stuart F James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Fryar Trucking
Represented By: Stuart F James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?