Hester v. Jacobs et al
Plaintiff: Todd G. Hester
Defendant: Richard Jacobs and Candido's Inc. doing business as Candido's Towing & Repair
Case Number: 3:2025cv00030
Filed: January 22, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Crytzer
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2025 Filing 20 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Candido's Inc.. (Gaia, Geoffrey)
March 11, 2025 Filing 19 Certificate of Citizenship by Candido's Inc.. (Gaia, Geoffrey)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 3/10/2025. c/m Brad W Thomas, Fried Rogers Goldberg LLC, 3550 Lenox Road Northeast,Suite 1500, Atlanta, GA 30326. (Attachments: #1 Other Consent Form) (MKM)
March 10, 2025 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by Candido's Inc., Richard Jacobs. (MKM)
March 10, 2025 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Candido's Inc. (MKM)
March 7, 2025 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Candido's and by Richard Jacobs.(Gaia, Geoffrey)
March 6, 2025 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gaia, Geoffrey)
February 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. The Court ORDERS the Parties to confer and submit the required Rule 26(f) report on or before March 14, 2025. For the convenience of the Parties, the Courts Judicial Preferences and a Sample Civil Scheduling Order are available at https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/katherine-crytzer-united-states-district-judge. The Court will determine whether to hold a Rule 16 scheduling conference after receiving the Parties Rule 26(f) report. Signed by District Judge Katherine A. Crytzer on 2/14/2025. This docket entry constitutes the complete order of the Court. (RRG). c/m Brad W Thomas, Fried Rogers Goldberg LLC, 3550 Lenox Road Northeast, Suite 1500, Atlanta, GA 30326 on 2/18/2025 (MKM).
February 13, 2025 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND by All Defendants. (Gaia, Geoffrey)
February 13, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey G Gaia on behalf of All Defendants (Gaia, Geoffrey)
February 6, 2025 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Order. (Goldberg, Michael)
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 01/31/2025. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN) c/m Brad W Thomas, Fried Rogers Goldberg LLC, 3550 Lenox Road Northeast, Suite 1500, Atlanta, GA 30326 on 1/31/2025 (MKM).
January 31, 2025 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bradford W. Thomas ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5894789.) filed by Todd G. Hester (ABF)
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING JURISDICTION. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a response to this Order on or before 2/11/2025 with facts sufficient to show that this Court has jurisdiction over the action. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 1/29/2025. (MKM)
January 29, 2025 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Candido's Inc. on 01/28/2025, filed by Todd G. Hester. (Goldberg, Michael)
January 28, 2025 Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bradford W. Thomas ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5894789.) by Todd G. Hester. (Attachments: #1 Other AL Supreme Court Cert of Good Standing, #2 Other GA Supreme Court Cert of Good Standing, #3 Other SC Supreme Court Cert of Good Standing, #4 Other USDC GA Northern District Cert of Good Standing, #5 Other USDC GA Middle District Cert of Good Standing, #6 Other USDC GA Southern District Cert of Good Standing, #7 Other USDC SC Cert of Good Standing)(Goldberg, Michael)
January 28, 2025 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Richard Jacobs on 01/24/2025, filed by Todd G. Hester. (Goldberg, Michael)
January 24, 2025 Filing 6 Certificate of Citizenship by Todd G. Hester. (Goldberg, Michael)
January 22, 2025 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (MKM)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 1/22/2025. (MKM)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 1/22/2025. (MKM)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 1/22/2025. (MKM)
January 22, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5887749.), filed by Todd G. Hester. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Candido's Inc., #3 Summons Richard Jacobs)(Goldberg, Michael)
January 22, 2025 District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (MKM)
January 22, 2025 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by Todd G. Hester. (MKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hester v. Jacobs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd G. Hester
Represented By: Michael L Goldberg
Represented By: Brad W Thomas
Represented By: Brad W Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Jacobs
Represented By: Geoffrey G Gaia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candido's Inc. doing business as Candido's Towing & Repair
Represented By: Geoffrey G Gaia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?