Scott v. O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc
Plaintiff: Darrell Scott
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc
Case Number: 4:2018cv00064
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael E. Auffenorde on behalf of by Darrell Scott. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 11/01/2018. (KRS, ) Modified on 11/2/2018 (BJL, ).*Mailed to Attorney Michael E. Auffenorde.
October 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. (BJL, )Summons was issued manually but a copy of the summons was not kept in the Clerk's Office.
October 26, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Darrell Scott as to Darrell Scott (BJL, )*Mailed to Attorney Michael E Auffenorde Modified on 10/26/2018 (BJL, ).
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 10/26/2018. (BJL, ) *Mailed to Attorney Michael E Auffenorde
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 10/26/2018. (BJL, )*Mailed to Attorney Michael E Auffenorde
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 10/26/2018. (BJL,)*Mailed to Attorney Michael E Auffenorde
October 26, 2018 Error Docket Entry-10/26/2018 (BJL, ).
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt # C1016005), filed by Darrell Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BJL, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael E. Auffenorde (Filing fee $ 90.00, receipt # C1016005) by Darrell Scott. (BJL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Scott
Represented By: Michael E Auffenorde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?