Boren v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Shanan Marie Boren
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2018cv00065
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to SSA Office of General Counsel, Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (BDG, )Summons packet forwarded to USMS.
November 9, 2018 Per Court Order (Doc 6 ), service packets mailed to Attorney Grayson Smith Cannon. (AML, )
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Presently before the Court is an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (in forma pauperis)[Doc. 2] filed by Plaintiff, Shanan Marie Boren. After a review of the application, it is hereby ORDERED that the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs [Doc. 2] is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a service packet to Plaintiff, or, if she is represented by counsel, to her attorney. It shall be the responsibility of Plaintiff or her attorney to complete the forms in the service packet and return such completed service packet to the Clerk of Court within thirty (30) days from receipt thereof. Should Plaintiff fail to return the completed service packet to the Clerk of Court within that thirty day period, her case MAY BE SUBJECT TO DISMISSAL by the Court. Upon receipt of the completed service packet, the Clerk of Court shall issue the summonses and forward such summonses and USM-285 forms to the U.S. Marshal for service of process. This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 11/8/18. (Steger, Christopher)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 10-26-18. (KMG, ) Modified on 10/29/2018 Serviced to Grayson Cannon. (aws, )
October 25, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Shanan Marie Boren as to Shanan Marie Boren. (BDG, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Grayson Smith Cannon on behalf of Shanan Marie Boren. (BDG, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number c1016086) by Shanan Marie Boren. (BDG, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shanan Marie Boren. (BDG, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against SSA Office of General Counsel, Social Security Administration, Commissioner of filed by Shanan Marie Boren. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 USM-Form, #4 USM-Form, #5 USM-Form)(BDG, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boren v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanan Marie Boren
Represented By: Grayson Smith Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?