Hubbard v. Tate & Kirlin Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Steven Erich Hubbard
Defendant: Tate & Kirlin Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00079
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Erich Hubbard (Attachments: #1 envelope)(DJH, )
January 8, 2019 Copy of Notice mailed to new address for Steven Erich Hubbard (DJH, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (DJH, )
January 3, 2019 Mailed copy of text order granting IFP to plaintiff Steven Erich Hubbard (DJH, )
January 3, 2019 Service Packet w/285 form and summons completed and submitted VIA HAND DELIVERED USM for service (Copy of Complaint, Order granting IFP and the above forms) (DJH, )
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3), the United States Marshal or a deputy marshal shall serve the defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 1/3/19. This entry constitutes the complete order of the Court. (KMG, )
January 2, 2019 Mailed all documents to plaintiff re: docket sheet, notice regarding NOA, order regarding depositions,motion to dismiss, and sealing confidential information (DJH, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (DJH, )
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/21/2018. (DJH, )
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/21/2018. (DJH, )
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/21/2018. (DJH, )
December 21, 2018 Summons rec'd but not issued. Waiting on order from court. (DJH, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Erich Hubbard. (DJH, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tate & Kirlin Associates, Inc. (Filing fee $ 0.)(IFP granted 1/3/2019), filed by Steven Erich Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DJH, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2019: #2 Other envelope) (DJH, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2019: #3 Other Summons) (DJH, ). Modified on 1/3/2019 (DJH, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubbard v. Tate & Kirlin Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Erich Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate & Kirlin Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?