Cannon v. Bedford County Jail
Plaintiff: Micheal Cannon
Defendant: Bedford County Jail and Bedford County
Case Number: 4:2019cv00014
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: All allegations in the complaint except those regarding Plaintiff sleeping on the floor without a mat and being denied any recreation time fail to state a claim upon which relief may be granted under 1983 and are therefore DISMISSED; The Clerk is DIRECTED to substitute Bedford County as the named Defendant in this matter; The Clerk is also DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a service packet (a blank summons and USM 285 form) for Defendant Bedford County; Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the service packet and return it to the Clerk's Office within twenty (20) days of entry of this order; Plaintiff is NOTIFIED that if he fails to timely return the completed service packet, this action may be dismissed; Plaintiff is ORDERED to immediately inform the Court and Defendant Bedford County or its counsel of record of any address changes in writing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.13, Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 4/6/2019. (BJL, )*Mailed to Micheal Cannon, along with a service packet as directed in the order herein. Modified on 4/8/2019 (BJL, ).
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Because Plaintiff is an inmate in the Bedford County Jail, he is ASSESSED the civil filingfee of $350.00. The custodian of Plaintiff's inmate trust account is DIRECTED to the Clerk as set forth in the order herein. The Clerk is also DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this order to the Court's financial deputy. Plaintiff is ORDERED to immediately inform the Court and Defendant or its counsel of record of any address changes in writing. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 2/19/2019. (BJL,)*Mailed to Michael Cannon and Bedford County Jail's Inmate Trust Account Custodian. Also, forwarded to the Court's financial deputy.
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (BJL, )*Mailed to Micheal Cannon.
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Bedford County Jail, filed by Micheal Cannon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BJL, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Micheal Cannon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BJL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannon v. Bedford County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bedford County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bedford County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?