Cole v. Go Plus Corp
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn E. Cole
Defendant: Go Plus Corp d/b/a COSTWAY.COM.INC and Go Plus Corp
Case Number: 4:2019cv00020
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2019 04:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (GRE, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Go Plus Corp. (Johnson, David)
March 28, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Go Plus Corp. (aws, )
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/27/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (aws, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Go Plus Corp.(Johnson, David)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/26/19. (ABF)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/26/19. (ABF)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/26/19. (ABF)
February 22, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (ABF)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Bedford County, case number 2018-cv-13402. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3900116), filed by Go Plus Corp d/b/a COSTWAY.COM.INC. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit ROS, #5 Exhibit Return of Service)(Johnson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Go Plus Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Go Plus Corp d/b/a COSTWAY.COM.INC
Represented By: David L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Go Plus Corp
Represented By: David L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn E. Cole
Represented By: Arthur E McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?