Watts v. Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al (TV2)

Plaintiff: Peggy Watts
Defendant: Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Huahui U.S., Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC, Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00022
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Christopher H Steger
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opened in District of New Jersey as case number 1:19-cv-08718. (AML, )
March 18, 2019 Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (AML, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Transferred to USDC for District of New Jersey. (AML, )
March 14, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Huahui U.S., Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC, Torrent Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. (AML, )
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on March 4, 2019. (RLK)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on March 4, 2019. (RLK)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on March 4, 2019. (RLK)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel re: Civil Coversheet and Summons, requirements due by 3/11/2019. (RLK)
March 1, 2019 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (RLK)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Huahui U.S., Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC, Torrent Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3906092.), filed by Peggy Watts.(McKellar, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts v. Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huahui U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solco Healthcare US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrent Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Watts
Represented By: Andrea T McKellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?