Hughes et al v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Joshua VanDusen, Charles Dodson, Shannon Helmers and Ashton Hughes
Defendant: State of Tennessee, RVshare, LLC, Denise Jackson, Encompass Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, The General Insurance and GEICO General Insurance Co.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00028
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Shannon Helmers, Joshua VanDusen, Charles Dodson, Ashton Hughes.(Elbert, Philip)
July 16, 2019 Filing 24 Administrative Notice to Counsel #10 Notice of Appearance as to attorney Tess Heisserer: requirements due by 7/22/2019. Serviced via US Mail to attorney Heisserer.(KFB)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/15/19. (KFB) Modified on 7/15/2019 (KFB). Serviced via US Mail to Tess Medlin Heisserer.
July 12, 2019 Filing 22 Denise Jackson ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Denise Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Siciliano, Gerard)
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by RVshare, LLC.(Siciliano, Gerard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Defendant RVshare, LLC's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Thus, Defendant RVshare, LLC's responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' complaint shall be due on or before July 3, 2019. This docket text entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court signed by United States Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee. (Lee, Susan)
June 12, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by RVshare, LLC. (Siciliano, Gerard)
June 10, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Encompass Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Co., Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, The General Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(KFB)
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Summons to Geico General Insurance Company to be issued by Joshua VanDusen. (Elbert, Philip)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Summons to The General Insurance to be issued by Charles Dodson. (Elbert, Philip)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Summons to Encompass Insurance Company to be issued by Shannon Helmers. (Elbert, Philip)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Summons to Progressive Casualty Insurance Company to be issued by Ashton Hughes. (Elbert, Philip)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Corporate Interest by RVshare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Ohio Business Registration)(Siciliano, Gerard)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashton Hughes, Charles Dodson, Shannon Helmers, Joshua VanDusen. Denise Jackson waiver sent on 5/23/2019. (Aaron, Benjamin)
May 24, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by RVshare, LLC. (BDG)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending the Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by RVshare, LLC. (Siciliano, Gerard)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard M Siciliano on behalf of RVshare, LLC (Siciliano, Gerard)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashton Hughes, Charles Dodson, Shannon Helmers, Joshua VanDusen. State of Tennessee served on 5/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other - Proof of service (USPS Certified Mail documentation))(Elbert, Philip)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashton Hughes, Charles Dodson, Shannon Helmers, Joshua VanDusen. RVshare, LLC served on 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other - Proof of service (USPS Certified Mail documentation))(Elbert, Philip)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Ashton Hughes, Charles Dodson, Shannon Helmers, Joshua VanDusen as to Denise Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Other - USPS Certified Mail Tracking History)(Elbert, Philip)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 04/24/2019. (CAT)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 04/24/2019. (CAT)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 04/24/2019. (CAT)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference, please file the Civil Cover Sheet and Summons in a non-fillable format. (CAT)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Denise Jackson, RVshare, LLC, State of Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Summons RVshare, LLC, #2 Summons Attorney General) (CAT)
April 24, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (CAT)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3954951.), filed by Ashton Hughes, Charles Dodson, Shannon Helmers, Joshua VanDusen. (Attachments: #1 Other - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Denise Jackson, #3 Summons - RVshare, LLC, #4 Summons - Attorney General)(Elbert, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes et al v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua VanDusen
Represented By: Philip N Elbert
Represented By: Jeffrey Albert Zager
Represented By: Benjamin Cole Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Dodson
Represented By: Philip N Elbert
Represented By: Jeffrey Albert Zager
Represented By: Benjamin Cole Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Helmers
Represented By: Philip N Elbert
Represented By: Jeffrey Albert Zager
Represented By: Benjamin Cole Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashton Hughes
Represented By: Philip N Elbert
Represented By: Jeffrey Albert Zager
Represented By: Benjamin Cole Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RVshare, LLC
Represented By: Gerard M Siciliano
Represented By: Tess Medlin Heisserer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Jackson
Represented By: Gerard M Siciliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The General Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?