Bright v. Bartlett (PLR2)

Plaintiff: Edna Bright
Defendant: Rebecca N Bartlett
Case Number: 4:2019cv00033
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 5/14/2019. (BDG) Order mailed to Bright.
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 5/14/2019. (BDG) Order mailed to Bright.
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 5/14/2019. (BDG) Notice mailed to Bright.
May 14, 2019 Filing 30 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (BDG)Notice mailed to Bright.
May 14, 2019 Filing 29 Administrative Notice to Counsel: Attorney Michael Deel not registered for CM/ECF requirements due by 5/20/2019. (BDG) Notice mailed to Deel.
May 14, 2019 Filing 28 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:18-cv-00756.
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Accordingly, the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Doc. No. #25 ) is ADOPTED and APPROVED. The Motion for Transfer of Venue (Doc. No. #16 ) is GRANTED, and the Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Eastern District of Tennessee, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/9/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by Edna Bright re #25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Bartlett's motion to transfer venue (Doc. No. #16 ) be GRANTED and that this action be TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Tennessee under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/30/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 24 DENIAL OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT: Pending are the following motions filed by Plaintiff: Motion for Default Judgment as to Rebecca Bartlett (Doc. No. #17 ); Motion to Replace First Motion and Motion for Default Judgment as to Rebecca Bartlett (Doc. No. #18 ); Motion for Default Judgment as to Rebecca Bartlett (Doc. No. #20 ); Motion to Explain Error re: Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. No. #22 ); and Motion for Default Judgment as to Rebecca Bartlett (Doc. No. #23 ). In any event, an entry of default is not appropriate because Defendant Bartlett filed a Motion to Transfer Venue, or in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time (Doc. No. #16 ). Accordingly, the Clerk declines to enter default as to Defendant Bartlett. Therefore, Plaintiff's Motions for Default Judgment (Doc. Nos. #17 , #18 , #20 , #23 ), construed as Motions for Entry of Default Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, are DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion to Explain Error (Doc. No. #22 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Acting Clerk of Court on 4/19/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Rebecca N. Bartlett by Edna Bright. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Copy of previous Motion #16 by Defendant, #2 Attachment B - Copy of previous Memorandum in Support [16-1] by Defendant)(mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Explain Error re #17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Rebecca N. Bartlett by Edna Bright. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Replace First Motion re #17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Rebecca N. Bartlett, #17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Rebecca N. Bartlett, #20 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Edna Bright filed by Rebecca N. Bartlett. (Deel, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Default Judgment by Edna Bright. (mg) Modified text on 4/9/2019 (mg). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from Edna Bright. Letter reads: The defendant Attorney called on March 21, 2019 asking for an extension, the Plaintiff answer was no. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Replace First Motion and Motion for Default Judgment re #17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Rebecca N. Bartlett by Edna Bright. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Rebecca N. Bartlett by Edna Bright. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Transfer of Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time by Rebecca N. Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Law in Support)(Deel, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The motion #12 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling with the statement required by Local Rule 7.01(a)(1) regarding conference with all other counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/18/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (mg) Modified text on 3/18/2019 (mg). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
March 18, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael S. Deel. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Deel on behalf of Rebecca N. Bartlett (Deel, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Rebecca N. Bartlett. (Beemer, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by Edna Bright. Rebecca N. Bartlett served on 2/25/2019. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
March 13, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jeffrey M. Beemer. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Beemer on behalf of Rebecca N. Bartlett (Beemer, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 Summons issued as to Rebecca N. Bartlett. Service copies returned to Plaintiff at Intake. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Considering Bright's pro se status, the Court will construe her motion as one to extend the time to effect service of process under Rule 4(m). That motion (Doc. No. #8 ) is GRANTED. Bright is ORDERED to file proof of service of Defendant Bartlett by March 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/19/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Proceed by Edna Bright. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Bright is therefore ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by December 21, 2018, why her lawsuit should not be dismissed for failure to comply with Rule 4(m) or for failure to prosecute under Rule 41(b) and Local Rule 41.01(a). Bright is warned that her failure to respond to this order will likely result in a recommendation this her lawsuit be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/3/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 138, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Judge Eli Richardson for all purposes. All present deadlines and court dates shall remain in place, subject to modification by Judge Richardson or the magistrate judge. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/24/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/28/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 RECEIPT #34675051602 in the amount of $400.00 posted by Edna Bright re #1 Complaint. (am) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Pro se party called to inform the Court that she will be filing a Motion for extension of time to pay the filing fee. Pro se party mistakenly sent the $400 filing fee to the Eastern District Court. Pro se party was told by the Eastern District Court that they would mail the filing fee to our Office. (am) Modified Text on 8/22/2018 (am). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Accordingly, to pursue this action, Plaintiff MUST do one of the following within 14 days of her receipt of this order: (1) submit payment of the filing fee in the amount of $400.00 to the Clerk of this Court; or (2) submit a completed and properly supported in forma pauperis application. The Clerk is DIRECTED to forward to Plaintiff a blank Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (long form). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/15/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (Pro se party sent blank Ifp (long) form by regular mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
August 14, 2018 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (afs) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (afs) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rebecca N. Bartlett, filed by Edna Bright. (afs) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bright v. Bartlett (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca N Bartlett
Represented By: Jeffrey M Beemer
Represented By: Michael S. Deel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?