Admiral Insurance Company v. Florence
Plaintiff: Admiral Insurance Company
Defendant: David G. Florence
Case Number: 4:2019cv00037
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-Consent Form) (SAC)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by David G. Florence. (Huskey, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L Huskey on behalf of David G. Florence (Huskey, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Admiral Insurance Company re #9 Affidavit (Brown, Scott)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT re #8 Application for Clerk's Default, Amended Affidavit of Scott R. Brown by Admiral Insurance Company. (Brown, Scott)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to David G. Florence by Admiral Insurance Company. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Scott R. Brown)(Brown, Scott)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Admiral Insurance Company. David G. Florence served on 6/10/2019. (Brown, Scott)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 5/24/2019. (JCK)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 5/24/2019. (JCK)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 5/24/2019. (JCK)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel, Informational only. No action to be taken. For future reference please file the corporate disclosure statement using theevent Certificate of Corporate Interest found under the category OtherDocuments. (JCK)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to David G. Florence. (JCK)
May 24, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JCK)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David G. Florence ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3980878.), filed by Admiral Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #3 Exhibit 2 - Letter, Summons, Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notices of Claim, #5 Exhibit 4 - Motion for Default, #6 Exhibit 5 - Renewal Application, #7 Exhibit 6 - April 18, 2019 Letter, #8 Summons David G. Florence, #9 Corporate Interest Disclosure Statement)(Brown, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Admiral Insurance Company v. Florence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Admiral Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott R Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. Florence
Represented By: Robert L Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?