Lanza, Jr. v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (DCLC2)

Plaintiff: Dominick Joseph Lanza, Jr.
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv00045
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Thomas A Varlan no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Clifton L Corker for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/9/2019. (LMC)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dominick Joseph Lanza, Jr.. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 7/1/2019. (Palmer, Melissa)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 06/19/2019. (BRS)
June 17, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3998445.) filed by Dominick Joseph Lanza, Jr. (AML)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney's Office EDTN, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(AML)
June 17, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (AML)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3998445.) by Dominick Joseph Lanza, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Palmer, Melissa)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3998435.), filed by Dominick Joseph Lanza, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Palmer, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lanza, Jr. v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (DCLC2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Joseph Lanza, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa A Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?