Langford v. Fennell et al (JRG2)
Plaintiff: Gerald Langford
Defendant: LMR Trucking, Inc. and James Fennell
Case Number: 4:2019cv00047
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Revise by Gerald Langford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Priest, Timothy)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: To this date, the parties have failed to file a Rule 26(f) meeting report and as such, the parties did not comply with the requirements of the case management order. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties will have fourteen (14) days from the date hereof to file a report on the Rule 26(f) planning meeting that complies with all requirements of the case management order or this complaint will be dismissed for failure to prosecute.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/20/2019. (CAT)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by James Fennell, LMR Trucking, Inc. of Withdrawal of Evan S. Grant (Haltom White, Mary)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 Administrative Notice to Counsel White #10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Evan S Grant : requirements due by 8/6/2019. (SAC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Evan S. Grant by James Fennell, LMR Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Haltom White, Mary)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-Consent) (SAC)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 07/08/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AMP)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by James Fennell.(Haltom White, Mary)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by LMR Trucking, Inc..(Haltom White, Mary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Corporate Interest by LMR Trucking, Inc.. (Haltom White, Mary)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 6/28/2019. (JCK)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 6/28/2019. (JCK)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 6/28/2019. (JCK)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by LMR Trucking, Inc.. (JCK)
June 28, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JCK)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Coffee County, TN, case number 2019-CV-45942. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4010363), filed by James Fennell, LMR Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint and Summons, #3 Exhibit B-Notices of Removal to State Court Clerk and Plaintiff's Attorney)(Haltom White, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langford v. Fennell et al (JRG2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LMR Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Haltom White
Represented By: Evan Scott Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Fennell
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Haltom White
Represented By: Evan Scott Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Langford
Represented By: Timothy S Priest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?