Arthrodesis Technology LLC v. Vilex in Tennessee, Inc. et al (JRG1)
Plaintiff: Arthrodesis Technology LLC
Defendant: Vilex, Inc. and Vilex in Tennessee, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00056
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal of case by Arthrodesis Technology LLC. (Googe, Matthew)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8-23-19. (KMG) Modified on 8/26/2019 (BDG). Order mailed and emailed to Pfeiffer and Ostrow.
August 23, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Seth H. Ostrow ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4058392.) filed by Arthrodesis Technology LLC, #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sarah A. Pfeiffer ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4058398.) filed by Arthrodesis Technology LLC as to Arthrodesis Technology LLC (BDG)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sarah A. Pfeiffer ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4058398.) by Arthrodesis Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Googe, Matthew)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Seth H. Ostrow ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4058392.) by Arthrodesis Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Googe, Matthew)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arthrodesis Technology LLC. Vilex, Inc. waiver sent on 8/20/2019. (Googe, Matthew)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arthrodesis Technology LLC. Vilex in Tennessee, Inc. waiver sent on 8/20/2019. (Googe, Matthew)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/20/2019. (JCK)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/20/2019. (JCK)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/20/2019. (JCK)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Attorneys Seth Ostrow and Sarah Pfeiffer are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Seth Ostrow and Sarah Pfeiffer) (JCK)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Vilex in Tennessee, Inc., Vilex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Vilex, Inc.)(JCK)
August 20, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JCK)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding US6579293 . (Googe, Matthew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Arthrodesis Technology LLC. (Googe, Matthew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vilex in Tennessee, Inc., Vilex, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4052933.), filed by Arthrodesis Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Vilex in Tennessee, Inc., #7 Summons Vilex, Inc.)(Googe, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arthrodesis Technology LLC v. Vilex in Tennessee, Inc. et al (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthrodesis Technology LLC
Represented By: Matthew M Googe
Represented By: Michael E Robinson
Represented By: Sarah Pfeiffer
Represented By: Seth H Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vilex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vilex in Tennessee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?