Smith v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: John Steven Smith
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00060
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by General Motors LLC (Vague, Amie)
October 24, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Vague, Amie)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 09:00 AM in Chattanooga before District Judge Curtis L Collier. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020 04:00 PM in Chattanooga before District Judge Curtis L Collier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/22/19. (AWS)
October 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2019. Scheduling conference held in chambers without a court reporter or courtroom deputy. (CNC)
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A Wiseman, III on behalf of General Motors LLC (Wiseman, Thomas)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Clarence J Gideon, Jr on behalf of John Steven Smith (Gideon, Clarence)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 9-27-19. (KMG)
September 26, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by General Motors LLC. (AWS)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4087256.) (Certificate of Good Standing Rachel Lary) filed by General Motors LLC. (Vague, Amie)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Rachel Lary re #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: PHV Requirements Deadline:10/15/2019. (AWS)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4087256.) by General Motors LLC. (Vague, Amie)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 3:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (CBS)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AWS)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Rachel Lary #1 Notice of Removal: requirements due by 10/3/2019. (AWS)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by General Motors LLC. (Vague, Amie)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by General Motors LLC.(Vague, Amie)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/17/19. (ABF)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/17/19. (ABF)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/17/19. (ABF)
September 17, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by General Motors LLC. (ABF)
September 17, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (ABF)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lincoln County, TN, case number 19-cv-80. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4079899), filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Vague, Amie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Amie A Vague
Represented By: Rachel M Lary
Represented By: Thomas A Wiseman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Steven Smith
Represented By: Clarence J Gideon, Jr
Represented By: Raymond W Fraley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?